EP2643204 - APPARATUS TO LAUNCH AND RECOVER A BOAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ensco 392 Limited Exchange Tower 19 Canning Street Edinburgh EH3 8EH / GB | [2013/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARKE, Derek William Frank Bridge House Bridge Crescent Torphins Banchory Aberdeenshire AB31 4FQ / GB | [2013/40] | Representative(s) | Allan, James Stewart Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [2013/40] | Application number, filing date | 11805140.8 | 25.11.2011 | WO2011GB52335 | Priority number, date | GB20100020080 | 26.11.2010 Original published format: GB 201020080 | GB20110009994 | 14.06.2011 Original published format: GB 201109994 | GB20110015998 | 15.09.2011 Original published format: GB 201115998 | [2013/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012069853 | Date: | 31.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2643204 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B63B23/32 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
B63B23/32 (EP,US);
B63B27/36 (EP);
B63B35/40 (EP,US);
B63B2027/165 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/40] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR WASSERUNG UND RÜCKHOLUNG EINES BOOTES | [2013/40] | English: | APPARATUS TO LAUNCH AND RECOVER A BOAT | [2013/40] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT POUR METTRE À L'EAU ET RÉCUPÉRER UN BATEAU | [2013/40] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 14.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/28] | 21.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2014/28] | 21.02.2014 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19500182 (JANSSEN ADOLF [DE]) [X] 1-6,9-39 * column 3, line 9 - line 27 *; | [Y]US6474256 (VOGEL WAYNE A [US]) [Y] 7,8* figures 2-4 *; | [XY]US2009257826 (BERGMANN HANS DIETER [DE]) [X] 1-6,9-11,16,18-32,37-39 * the whole document * [Y] 7,8 |