EP2656042 - ONLINE SAMPLING APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ONLINE SAMPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Source Technology ApS Albuen 56 B 6000 Kolding / DK | [2013/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jørgensen, Thomas Kniep Strandhøj 4 DK-6000 Kolding / DK | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | Gregersen, Niels Henrik, et al Patrade A/S Ceresbyen 75 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | Gregersen, Niels Henrik, et al Patrade A/S Fredens Torv 3A 8000 Aarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 11805394.1 | 20.12.2011 | WO2011DK50505 | Priority number, date | DK20100070564 | 21.12.2010 Original published format: DK 201070564 | [2013/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012083966 | Date: | 28.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2656042 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/20 | [2013/44] | CPC: |
G01N1/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ONLINE-ABTASTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ONLINE-ABTASTUNG | [2013/44] | English: | ONLINE SAMPLING APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ONLINE SAMPLING | [2013/44] | French: | APPAREIL D'ÉCHANTILLONNAGE EN LIGNE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR ÉCHANTILLONNAGE EN LIGNE | [2013/44] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 18.02.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE19909437 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document * [Y] 1-10; | [Y]US2010288040 (JOERGENSEN THOMAS KNIEP [DK]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US5309773 (TOKOYAMA KATSUMI [JP]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 23 *; | [A]US5454912 (DOUGHERTY STEVEN J [US]) [A] 4,5 * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US5563384 (MARLOW BRIAN S [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5074158 (TOKOYAMA KATSUMI [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US3217547 (CORDELL RAY R, et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4501162 (MATHEWES WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * | by applicant | WO2009092378 |