EP2595276 - SECONDARY BATTERY CHARGING METHOD AND CHARGING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2013/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKADA, Kosaku c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center IP Development Group 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2013/21] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11806578.8 | 09.06.2011 | WO2011JP63270 | Priority number, date | JP20100159442 | 14.07.2010 Original published format: JP 2010159442 | [2013/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012008247 | Date: | 19.01.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2595276 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.01.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, H01M10/44, H01M10/48, H02J7/04 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
H01M10/44 (EP,US);
G01R31/3835 (US);
H01M10/48 (EP,US);
H02J7/0049 (EP,US);
H02J7/00712 (EP,US);
H02J7/007184 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/21] | H02J7/10, H01M10/44, H01M10/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFLADEN EINER SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2013/21] | English: | SECONDARY BATTERY CHARGING METHOD AND CHARGING APPARATUS | [2013/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CHARGE DE BATTERIE RECHARGEABLE ET APPAREIL DE CHARGE | [2013/21] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2013 | Translation filed | 02.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 07.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/16] | 17.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5229705 (KATO TADASHI [JP]) [X] 3,4 * abstract * * column 5, lines 37-61; figures 3-5 * [A] 1,2; | [XA]US5467005 (MATSUMOTO TOSHIO [JP], et al) [X] 3,4 * abstract * * column 6, line 61 - column 7, line 26; figure 1(A) * * column 4, lines 26-32; figure 8 *[A] 1,2 | International search | [A]JPH02219424 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JPH06327167 (MAKITA CORP); | [A]JP2008086106 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |