EP2594262 - BACKING HAVING THREE-LAYER STRUCTURE AND AQUEOUS ADHESIVE PATCH INCLUDING THE BACKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/21] | SUBSTRATE OF THREE-LAYER STRUCTURE AND WATER-CONTAINING ADHESIVE PATCH INCLUDING SAME | ||
[2018/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd. 567 Sanbonmatsu Higashikagawa-shi, Kagawa 769-2695 / JP | [2013/25] |
Former [2013/21] | For all designated states Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd. 567 Sanbonmatsu Higashikagawa-shi, Kagawa 769-2695 / JP | ||
For all designated states Toyobo Co., Ltd. 2-8 Dojima Hama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8230 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIRAI, Sadanobu c/o TEIKOKU SEIYAKU CO. LTD. 567 Sanbonmatsu Higashikagawa-shi Kagawa 769-2695 / JP | 02 /
INAZUKI, Masahiro c/o TEIKOKU SEIYAKU CO. LTD. 567 Sanbonmatsu Higashikagawa-shi Kagawa 769-2695 / JP | 03 /
ISHIGURE, Miho c/o TEIKOKU SEIYAKU CO. LTD. 567 Sanbonmatsu Higashikagawa-shi Kagawa 769-2695 / JP | 04 /
ISODA, Hideo c/o TOYOBO CO., LTD. 1-1, Katata 2-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0292 / JP | 05 /
SAKAMOTO, Hiroyuki c/o TOYOBO CO., LTD. 1-1, Katata 2-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0292 / JP | 06 /
KOIDA, Takashi c/o TOYOBO CO., LTD. 2-8, Dojima Hama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8230 / JP | 07 /
SAKAGUCHI, Hiroyasu c/o TOYOBO CO., LTD. 2-8, Dojima Hama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8230 / JP | [2013/25] |
Former [2013/21] | 01 /
SHIRAI, Sadanobu c/o TEIKOKU SEIYAKU CO. LTD. 567 Sanbonmatsu Higashikagawa-shi Kagawa 769-2695 / JP | ||
02 /
INAZUKI, Masahiro c/o TEIKOKU SEIYAKU CO. LTD. 567 Sanbonmatsu Higashikagawa-shi Kagawa 769-2695 / JP | |||
03 /
ISHIGURE, Miho c/o TEIKOKU SEIYAKU CO. LTD. 567 Sanbonmatsu Higashikagawa-shi Kagawa 769-2695 / JP | |||
04 /
ISODA, Hideo c/o TOYO BOSEKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Katata 2-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0292 / JP | |||
05 /
SAKAMOTO, Hiroyuki c/o TOYO BOSEKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Katata 2-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0292 / JP | |||
06 /
KOIDA, Takashi c/o TOYO BOSEKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-8, Dojima Hama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8230 / JP | |||
07 /
SAKAGUCHI, Hiroyasu c/o TOYO BOSEKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-8, Dojima Hama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8230 / JP | Representative(s) | Adam, Holger, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2014/38] |
Former [2013/21] | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11806725.5 | 11.07.2011 | [2018/33] | WO2011JP65762 | Priority number, date | JP20100157988 | 12.07.2010 Original published format: JP 2010157988 | [2013/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012008395 | Date: | 19.01.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2594262 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2594262 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.01.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/70, A61K31/167, A61K31/192, A61K45/00, A61F13/02, B32B3/26 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
A61K9/703 (EP,US);
A61K9/7084 (KR);
A61F13/022 (US);
A61K31/167 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/192 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/7046 (EP,US);
A61K9/7061 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (KR);
B32B3/266 (US);
|
Former IPC [2013/21] | A61K9/70, A61K31/167, A61K31/192, A61K45/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/21] | Extension states | BA | 25.01.2013 | ME | 25.01.2013 | Title | German: | ABSCHLUSSSCHICHT MIT EINER DREISCHICHTIGEN STRUKTUR UND WASSERHALTIGES HEFTPFLASTER MIT EINER SOLCHEN ABSCHLUSSSCHICHT | [2018/10] | English: | BACKING HAVING THREE-LAYER STRUCTURE AND AQUEOUS ADHESIVE PATCH INCLUDING THE BACKING | [2018/10] | French: | COUCHE EXTÉRIEURE D'UNE STRUCTURE À TROIS COUCHES ET PANSEMENT ADHÉSIF AQUEUX INCLUANT LADITE COUCHE EXTÉRIEURE. | [2018/15] |
Former [2013/21] | SUBSTRAT MIT EINER DREISCHICHTIGEN STRUKTUR UND WASSERHALTIGES HEFTPFLASTER DAMIT | ||
Former [2013/21] | SUBSTRATE OF THREE-LAYER STRUCTURE AND WATER-CONTAINING ADHESIVE PATCH INCLUDING SAME | ||
Former [2013/21] | SUBSTRAT DE STRUCTURE À TROIS COUCHES ET PATCH ADHÉSIF CONTENANT DE L'EAU COMPRENANT CE DERNIER | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2013 | Translation filed | 25.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 13.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 15.08.2018 | AT | 15.08.2018 | CY | 15.08.2018 | CZ | 15.08.2018 | DK | 15.08.2018 | EE | 15.08.2018 | HR | 15.08.2018 | LT | 15.08.2018 | LV | 15.08.2018 | MC | 15.08.2018 | MK | 15.08.2018 | MT | 15.08.2018 | NL | 15.08.2018 | PL | 15.08.2018 | RO | 15.08.2018 | RS | 15.08.2018 | SI | 15.08.2018 | SK | 15.08.2018 | SM | 15.08.2018 | BG | 15.11.2018 | NO | 15.11.2018 | GR | 16.11.2018 | IS | 15.12.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CY | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
MT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CY | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | LT | 15.08.2018 | |
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | LT | 15.08.2018 | |
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 15.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0484543 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]); | [X]US5336210 (HIDAKA OSAFUMI [JP], et al); | [E]WO2012008396 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP], et al) | International search | [A]JPH03161435 (LION CORP); | [Y]JPH06238784 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [X]JPH08260328 (JAPAN VILENE CO LTD); | [A]JPH09208469 (MIKASA SEIYAKU KK); | [X]JP2000143503 (OOSHIN SEIYAKU KK); | [A]JP2003053894 (KURARAY CO); | [Y]JP2007031322 (LION CORP) |