EP2593565 - METHODS TO IDENTIFY COMBINATIONS OF NS5A TARGETING COMPOUNDS THAT ACT SYNERGISTICALLY TO INHIBIT HEPATITIS C VIRUS REPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 05843-4000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Jin-Hua c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford Connecticut 06492 / US | 02 /
GAO, Min c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford Connecticut 06492 / US | 03 /
O'BOYLE II, Donald R. c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford Connecticut 06492 / US | 04 /
LEMM, Julie A. c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford Connecticut 06492 / US | 05 /
ROBERTS, Susan B. c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford Connecticut 06492 / US | 06 /
BELEMA, Makonen c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford Connecticut 06492 / US | 07 /
MEANWELL, Nicholas A. c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford Connecticut 06492 / US | [2013/21] | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstraße 4 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11807424.4 | 13.07.2011 | WO2011US43785 | Priority number, date | US20100364851P | 16.07.2010 Original published format: US 364851 P | [2013/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012009394 | Date: | 19.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2593565 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12Q1/70, C12Q1/02, C12Q1/18, G01N33/50 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
C12Q1/18 (EP,US);
C12Q1/025 (US);
G01N33/5008 (EP,US);
G01N2333/186 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/21] | C12Q1/68, C12Q1/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIKATION VON KOMBINATIONEN AUS NSSA-ANZIELENDEN VERBINDUNGEN MIT SYNERGISTISCHER WIRKUNG ZUR HEMMUNG EINER HEPATITIS-C-VIRENREPLIKATION | [2013/21] | English: | METHODS TO IDENTIFY COMBINATIONS OF NS5A TARGETING COMPOUNDS THAT ACT SYNERGISTICALLY TO INHIBIT HEPATITIS C VIRUS REPLICATION | [2013/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉS POUR L'IDENTIFICATION DE COMBINAISONS DE COMPOSÉS CIBLANT DE NS5A QUI AGISSENT SYNERGIQUEMENT POUR INHIBER LA RÉPLICATION DU VIRUS DE L'HÉPATITE C | [2013/21] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 03.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/49] | 09.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2004014313 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al) [I] 1-28 * the whole document * * page 113, line 22 - page 117; tables 4-7 * * page 1, lines 5-11 * * page 3, line 12 - page 5, line 10 * * pages 23-31; claims 1-39 *; | [I]US2006276511 (SERRANO-WU MICHAEL [US], et al) [I] 1-28 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0025] , [0026] , [0222] - [0225] - [0316] - [0326] *; | [E]WO2011109037 (ENANTA PHARM INC [US], et al) [E] 1-28* the whole document *; | [I] - OWENS CHRISTOPHER M ET AL, "A COMBINATION OF A NOVEL CYCLOPHILIN INHIBITOR AND A NOVEL PUTATIVE NS5A INHIBITOR WITH POTENT ANTI-HCV ACTIVITY SYNERGISTICALLY INHIBITS VIRAL REPLICATION AND CURES REPLICON CELLS IN THE PRESENCE OR ABSENCE OF INTERFERON-alpha", HEPATOLOGY, & 60TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-ASSOCIATION-FOR-THE-STUDY-OF-LIVER-DISEASES; BOSTON, MA, USA; OCTOBER 30 -NOVEMBER 03, 2009, (20091030), vol. 50, no. 4, Suppl. S, ISSN 0270-9139, page 1046A, XP008165527 [I] 1-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hep.23306 | [Y] - R. A. FRIDELL ET AL, "Resistance Analysis of the Hepatitis C Virus NS5A Inhibitor BMS-790052 in an In Vitro Replicon System", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (20100628), vol. 54, no. 9, doi:10.1128/AAC.00556-10, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 3641 - 3650, XP055073884 [Y] 1-28 * the whole document * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AAC.00556-10 | [Y] - SARRAZIN G ET AL, "Mutations in de Protein Kinase-Binding Domain of the NS5A protein in Patens Infected woth Hepatitis C. Virus Type 1a Are Associated with Treatment Response", JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES.JID, UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO PRESS, CHICAGO, IL, (20000101), vol. 181, doi:10.1086/315263, ISSN 0022-1899, pages 432 - 441, XP002989689 [Y] 1-28 * the whole document * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1086/315263 | [Y] - GAO MIN ET AL, "Chemical genetics strategy identifies an HCV NS5A inhibitor with a potent clinical effect", NATURE: INTERNATIONAL WEEKLY JOURNAL OF SCIENCE (AND SUPPLEMENTARY INFORMATION), NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, UNITED KINGDOM, (20100101), vol. 465, no. 7294, doi:10.1038/NATURE08960, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 96 - 100, XP008131386 [Y] 1-28 * the whole document * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature08960 | [Y] - JULIE A LEMM ET AL, "Identification of Hepatitis C Virus NS5A Inhibitors", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, vol. 84, no. 1, doi:10.1128/JVI.01360-09, ISSN 0022-538X, (20100101), pages 482 - 491, (20091007), XP002639563 [Y] 1-28 * the whole document * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.01360-09 | [Y] - FRANGEUL L ET AL, "MUTATIONS IN NS5A REGION OF HEPATITIS C VIRUS GENOME CORRELATE WITH PRESENCE OF NS5A ANTIBODIES AND RESPONSE TO INTERFERON THERAPY FOR MOST COMMON EUROPEAN HEPATITIS C VIRUS GENOTYPES", HEPATOLOGY, WILEY, USA, (19981201), vol. 28, no. 6, doi:10.1002/HEP.510280630, ISSN 0270-9139, pages 1674 - 1679, XP008051673 [Y] 1-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hep.510280630 | International search | [Y] - TOMEI ET AL., "Characterization of the inhibition of hepatitis C virus RNA replication by nonnuclosides.", J VIROLOGY, (200401), vol. 78, no. 2, pages 938 - 946, XP002407558 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.78.2.938-946.2004 | [Y] - GAO ET AL., "Chemical genetics strategy identifies an HCV NS5A inhibitor with a potent clinical effect.", NATURE, (20100506), vol. 465, no. 7294, pages 96 - 100, XP008131386 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature08960 | [Y] - FRIDELL ET AL., "Resistance Analysis of the Hepatitis C Virus NS5A Inhibitor BMS-790052 in an In Vitro Replicon System.", ANFIMICROB AGENTS CHEMOTHER, (201009), vol. 54, no. 9, pages 3641 - 3650, XP055073884 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AAC.00556-10 | [Y] - LEMM ET AL., "identification of hepatitis C virus NS5A inhibitors.", J VIROL, (201001), vol. 84, pages 482 - 491, XP002639563 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.01360-09 | [A] - LOVE ET AL., "Crystal structure of a novel dimericform of NS5A domain I protein from hepatitis C virus.", J VIROL, (200905), vol. 83, no. 9, pages 4395 - 4403, XP008162274 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.02352-08 |