EP2673632 - ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR DETECTING HYDROGEN PEROXIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2013/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEFF, Petra Vaihinger Strasse 32 C 70567 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
WIDENMEYER, Markus Lachenstrasse 14 71101 Schoenaich / DE | [2013/51] | Application number, filing date | 11807884.9 | 14.12.2011 | WO2011EP72795 | Priority number, date | DE20111003720 | 07.02.2011 Original published format: DE102011003720 | [2013/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012107134 | Date: | 16.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2673632 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N31/22, A61L2/28, C12Q1/22, C12Q1/28, G01N21/78 | [2013/51] | CPC: |
C12Q1/22 (EP,US);
G01N31/223 (US);
G01N21/783 (EP,US);
G01N31/226 (EP,US);
Y10T436/206664 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/51] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM DETEKTIEREN VON WASSERSTOFFPEROXID | [2013/51] | English: | ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR DETECTING HYDROGEN PEROXIDE | [2013/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE DÉTECTER DU PEROXYDE D'HYDROGÈNE | [2013/51] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/51] | 26.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP1217373 (ETHICON INC [US]) [X] 1-3,6,8-10 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraphs [0025] - [0027] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0044] * * claims 1-7 * [Y] 4,5,7; | [Y]US2002122744 (HUI HENRY K [US], et al) [Y] 4-8* paragraph [0040] *; | [Y]WO03006076 (PHARMACEUTICAL SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 1-10 * page 1, lines 9-10 * * page 14, line 25 - page 15, line 10 * * Description of figures 1-4;; figures 1-4 * * page 17, line 13 - page 18, line 6 * * page 24, line 27 - page 25, line 12 *; | [Y]EP2020597 (METTLER TOLEDO AG [CH]) [Y] 4-8 * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0052] *; | [Y]WO2010078422 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 1, lines 10-16 * * page 15, lines 23-28 * * page 20, lines 9-16 * * Punkt 87, exemplary embodiments; page 43 *; | [XP]EP2299263 (KRONES AG [DE]) [XP] 1-3 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraphs [0022] - [0025] * * pages 47-48 * | Examination | JPH0662894 | DE10105528 | by applicant | EP1217373 | WO03006076 | WO2010078422 | - SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B, (2001), vol. 74, pages 194 - 199 | - YUICHI KOMAZAKI, "Automated measurement system for H202 in the atmosphere by diffusion scrubber sampling and HPLC analysis of Ti(IV)-PAR-H202 complex", ANALYST, (2001), vol. 126, pages 587 - 593 |