EP2649771 - A METHOD FOR AUTHENTICATION AND VERIFICATION OF USER IDENTITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | [2013/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOSKOVITCH, Robert 40/29 Moshe Sharett Street 78741 Ashkelon / IL | [2013/42] | Representative(s) | Schollweck, Susanne ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | Schollweck, Susanne Dr. Volker Vossius Patentanwälte / Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11808362.5 | 04.12.2011 | WO2011IL00920 | Priority number, date | IL20100209793 | 06.12.2010 Original published format: IL 20979310 | [2013/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012077098 | Date: | 14.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2649771 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, G06F21/00, G07C9/00 | [2013/42] | CPC: |
G06F21/32 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (US);
H04L63/083 (EP,US);
H04L63/0861 (EP,US);
G07C9/33 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG UND VERIFIZIERUNG EINER BENUTZERIDENTITÄT | [2013/42] | English: | A METHOD FOR AUTHENTICATION AND VERIFICATION OF USER IDENTITY | [2013/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AUTHENTIFICATION ET DE VÉRIFICATION D'IDENTITÉ D'UTILISATEUR | [2013/42] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/42] | 20.11.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2008098222 (ZILBERMAN ARKADY G [US]) [X] 1-3,10-12 * abract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0007] , [0008] * * paragraphs [0030] - [0034] - [0036] * * paragraphs [0044] , [0045] , [0051] * * paragraphs [0054] , [0055] , [0062] * * paragraphs [0069] , [0071] , [0077] * [I] 4-9; | [XI] - Ross, Jackson, M;iyake, Boneh, Mitchell, "Stronger Password Authentication Using Browser Extensions", (200509), pages 1 - 15, URL: http://crypto.stanford.edu/PwdHash/pwdhash.pdf, (20120308), XP002671214 [X] 1-4,10-12 * page 4, column r, line 15 - line 16 * * section 3.3.2 * * section 3.3.3 * [I] 5-9 | [A] - Bianchi, Oakley, Kwon, "The Secure Haptic Keypad: A Tactile Password System", Atlanta, GA, USA, (20100410), pages 1089 - 1092, CHI 2010: Input, Security, and Privacy Policies, URL: http://robot.kaist.ac.kr/paper/view.php?n=287, (20120308), XP002671215 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * section System Description * | [A] - Teh, Teoh, Tee, Ong, "Keystroke dynamics in password authentication enhancement", Expert Systems with Applications, vol. 37, no. 12, (20100706), pages 8618 - 8627, URL: http://pdn.sciencedirect.com/science?_ob=MiamiImageURL&_cid=271506&_user=987766&_pii=S0957417410006019&_check=y&_origin=article&_zone=toolbar&_coverDate=31-Dec-2010&view=c&originContentFamily=serial&wchp=dGLzVlB-zSkWb&md5=f432ce3c9715a76e05a7613b129d2ff7/1-s2.0-S0957417410006019-main.pdf, (20120309), XP002671216 [A] 1-12 * section 3.1 section 3.2 * * figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.ESWA.2010.06.097 | by applicant | EP0917678 | - A PEACOCK; X KE; M WILKERSON, "Typing Patterns: A Key to User Identification", IEEE SECURITY & PRIVACY, (2004), pages 1540 - 7993,04 | - R. V. YAMPOLSKIY; V. GOVINDARAJU, "Behavioral Biometrics: a Survey and Classification", INT. J. BIOMETRICS, (2008), vol. 1, no. 1, XP002604996 | - S. CHO; C. HAN; D.H. HAN; H.I. KIM, "Web-Based Keystroke Dynamics Identity Verification Using Neural Network", JOURNAL OF ORGANIZATIONAL COMPUTING AND ELECTRONIC COMMERCE, (2000), vol. 10, no. 4, pages 295 - 307 | - D. BARTMANN; M. WIMMER, "Kein Problem mehr mit vergessenen Passwörtern", DATENSCHUTZ UND DATENSICHERHEIT-DUD, (2007), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 199 - 202 | - F.BERGADANO; D.GUNETTI; C.PCARDI, "User Authentication through Keystroke Dynamics", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION AND SYSTEM SECURITY, (2002), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 367 - 397 | - S HWANG; S CHO; S PARK, KEYSTROKE DYNAMICS-BASED AUTHENTICATION FOR MOBILE DEVICES, COMPUTERS AND SECURITY, (2009), vol. 2, no. 8, pages 85 - 93 | - N.L. CLARKE; S.M. FURNELL, ADVANCED USER AUTHENTICATION FOR MOBILE DEVICES, COMPUTERS & SECURITY, (2007), vol. 26, pages 109 - 119 | - CLARKE N; FURNELL S; LINES B; REYNOLDS P., "Using keystroke analysis as a mechanism for subscriber authentication on mobile handsets", PROCEEDINGS OF IFIP SEC 2003, (20030526), pages 97 - 108 |