EP2659577 - RELATIVE EFFICIENCY MEASUREMENT IN A CONVERTER WITH PULSE WIDTH MODULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microchip Technology Incorporated 2355 West Chandler Boulevard Chandler, AZ 85224-6199 / US | [2013/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEARBORN, Scott 24109 State Route 167 Brackney, PA 18812 / US | 02 /
CLEVELAND, Terry, L. 1958 Dutchtown Road Endicott, NY 13760 / US | 03 /
ELLISON, Clifford, N., III 8462 Vieley Road Campbell, NY 14821 / US | [2013/45] | Representative(s) | sgb europe Bergstrasse 31 82069 Hohenschäftlarn / DE | [2024/42] |
Former [2013/45] | Grubert, Andreas King & Spalding International LLP 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | Application number, filing date | 11808415.1 | 09.12.2011 | [2024/42] | WO2011US64186 | Priority number, date | US201061427856P | 29.12.2010 Original published format: US 201061427856 P | US201113313223 | 07.12.2011 Original published format: US201113313223 | [2013/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012091884 | Date: | 05.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2659577 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2659577 | Date: | 16.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/157, H02M3/158 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
H02M3/157 (EP,KR,US);
H02M3/158 (KR);
H02M3/10 (KR);
H02M3/155 (KR);
H02M3/1588 (EP,US);
H02M1/0048 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MESSUNG EINES RELATIVEN WIRKUNGSGRADS IN EINEM PWM UMRICHTER | [2024/22] | English: | RELATIVE EFFICIENCY MEASUREMENT IN A CONVERTER WITH PULSE WIDTH MODULATION | [2013/45] | French: | MESURE DE RENDEMENT RELATIF DANS UN CONVERTISSEUR MODULATION D'IMPULSIONS EN LARGEUR | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/45] | MESSUNG DER RELATIVEN EFFIZIENZ BEI EINEM KONVERTER MIT PULSWEITENMODULATION | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/45] | 25.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.02.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 10.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Appeal following examination | 30.03.2020 | Appeal received No. T1602/20 | 06.07.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.04.2023 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2023/14] | 03.08.2023 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2023/31] | 21.02.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 27.02.2024 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2009146630 (NAKA TOSHIYUKI [JP]); | [I]US7825642 (YOUNG CHRIS M [US], et al) | by applicant | US2009146630 | US7825642 | US20100959837 |