|
09.09.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2024 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2024 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.09.2024 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.09.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.2024 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2024 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.2024 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.05.2024 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2024 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
10.05.2024 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
27.02.2024 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
27.02.2024 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
03.08.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.08.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
16 |
|
03.08.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.08.2023 |
Description |
Appeal |
13 |
|
03.08.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2023 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.04.2023 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2020 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.07.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.07.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.07.2020 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
30.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.03.2020 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2020 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2020 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
24.02.2020 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
02.08.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.07.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.08.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
31.08.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.05.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.01.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.08.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
25.08.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2013 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
08.08.2013 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2013 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.07.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
29.07.2013 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
29.07.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
29.07.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.07.2013 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.07.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2013 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.05.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
08.05.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.05.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
25.07.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
25.07.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
05.07.2012 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
02.02.2012 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Notification relating to priority claim |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Description |
Appeal |
14 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
14 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |