13.09.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
10.09.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
09.09.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.09.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.05.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.04.2024 |
Change - German title |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
23.02.2024 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
19.12.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.08.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of observations in an appeal |
|
31.03.2023 |
New entry: Invitation to file observations in an appeal + time limit |
|
21.12.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.12.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.12.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.07.2020 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
07.07.2020 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal |
|
31.03.2020 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
31.03.2020 |
New entry: Appeal number |
|
23.02.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
19.02.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
20.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.07.2019 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
04.01.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.01.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.09.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.05.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
03.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.08.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
06.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.01.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.09.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.08.2016 |
First examination report |
|
08.01.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.06.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
10.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.05.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
09.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.10.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
04.10.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
21.08.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.08.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.07.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.07.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.07.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.07.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.05.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.07.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.07.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.01.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|