EP2651608 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A SAFETY APPARATUS FOR A HANDLING DEVICE, AND HANDLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/43] | METHOD FOR OPERATING A SAFETY APPARATUS FOR A HANDLING DEVICE, SAFETY APPARATUS FOR A HANDLING DEVICE, AND HANDLING DEVICE | ||
[2022/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2013/43] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHLAICH, Peter Quellenstr. 16/3 71229 Leonberg / DE | 02 /
ROETHLING, Frank Kupferstr. 21 33649 Bielefeld / DE | [2013/43] | Application number, filing date | 11808609.9 | 09.12.2011 | [2023/06] | WO2011EP72330 | Priority number, date | DE20101063208 | 16.12.2010 Original published format: DE102010063208 | [2013/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012080123 | Date: | 21.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2651608 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2651608 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/16, B25J13/08, B25J19/06 | [2013/43] | CPC: |
B25J9/1676 (EP,US);
B25J13/086 (EP,US);
B25J19/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER SICHERUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE HANDHABUNGSVORRICHTUNG, UND HANDHABUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/39] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A SAFETY APPARATUS FOR A HANDLING DEVICE, AND HANDLING DEVICE | [2022/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR FONCTIONNEMENT DE DISPOSITIF DE SÉCURITÉ POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE MANIPULATION, ET DISPOSITIF DE MANIPULATION | [2022/39] |
Former [2013/43] | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER SICHERUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE HANDHABUNGSVORRICHTUNG, SICHERUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE HANDHABUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND HANDHABUNGSVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2013/43] | METHOD FOR OPERATING A SAFETY APPARATUS FOR A HANDLING DEVICE, SAFETY APPARATUS FOR A HANDLING DEVICE, AND HANDLING DEVICE | ||
Former [2013/43] | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN DISPOSITIF DE SÉCURITÉ POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE MANIPULATION, DISPOSITIF DE SÉCURITÉ POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE MANIPULATION ET DISPOSITIF DE MANIPULATION | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/43] | 04.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2020 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 08.02.2023 | EE | 08.02.2023 | ES | 08.02.2023 | FI | 08.02.2023 | HR | 08.02.2023 | IT | 08.02.2023 | LT | 08.02.2023 | LV | 08.02.2023 | MC | 08.02.2023 | NL | 08.02.2023 | PL | 08.02.2023 | RO | 08.02.2023 | RS | 08.02.2023 | SI | 08.02.2023 | SK | 08.02.2023 | SM | 08.02.2023 | NO | 08.05.2023 | GR | 09.05.2023 | IS | 08.06.2023 | PT | 09.06.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 08.02.2023 | |
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
IT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SI | 08.02.2023 | ||
SK | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | CZ | 08.02.2023 | |
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SI | 08.02.2023 | ||
SK | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 08.02.2023 | |
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SK | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 08.02.2023 | |
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | EE | 08.02.2023 | |
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 08.02.2023 | |
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | ES | 08.02.2023 | |
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 08.02.2023 | |
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 08.02.2023 | |
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 08.02.2023 | |
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 08.02.2023 | |
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 08.02.2023 | |
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 08.02.2023 | |
LT | 08.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0158593 (ELEKTRONIKTECHNOLOGIE GET [DE]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 7, line 25 - line 29 * * page 8, line 4 - line 16 *; | [A]FR2663105 (INST NAT SCIENCES APPLIQ LYON [FR]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 4, line 3 - line 11 * * page 6, line 17 - line 20 *; | [A]EP0518836 (NASA [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract ** column 2, line 42 - line 55 *; | [X]DE102008063081 (UNIV HANNOVER [DE]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraphs [0037] , [0038] * * paragraph [0049] * * claims 18,19 * | Examination | JPH11226889 | EP1323503 | WO2010063319 | by applicant | EP1323503 | DE102007062245 |