EP2710443 - MULTIFUNCTION BUTTON AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/13] | MULTIFUNCTION CONTROL BUTTON AND DEVICE | ||
[2017/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.06.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Systemes Thermiques 8, Rue Louis-Lormand La Verrère 78320 Le Mesnil Saint Denis / FR | [2014/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUYNH, Tan Duc 46 avenue Paul Doumer F-93330 Neuilly Sur Marne / FR | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | Pothmann, Karsten Valeo Etudes Electroniques Service Propriété Industrielle 76 rue Auguste Perret - ZI Europarc 94046 Creteil Cedex / FR | [2014/13] | Application number, filing date | 11808903.6 | 16.12.2011 | [2017/48] | WO2011FR00663 | Priority number, date | FR20100005049 | 22.12.2010 Original published format: FR 1005049 | [2014/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012085363 | Date: | 28.06.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2710443 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2710443 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G05G9/02, G05G9/047 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
G05G9/047 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTIFUNKTIONSKNOPF UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2017/20] | English: | MULTIFUNCTION BUTTON AND APPARATUS | [2017/20] | French: | BOUTON ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE MULTIFONCTION | [2014/13] |
Former [2014/13] | MULTIFUNKTIONSSCHALTFLÄCHE UND VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2014/13] | MULTIFUNCTION CONTROL BUTTON AND DEVICE | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/13] | 23.07.2013 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 21.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2014/13] | 21.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/45] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees LU, AL, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 24.10.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 24.10.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.02.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 24.10.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 24.10.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.02.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 24.10.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 24.10.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.02.2014 | Decision despatched | 24.10.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 24.10.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.02.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2011 | AL | 29.11.2017 | AT | 29.11.2017 | CY | 29.11.2017 | CZ | 29.11.2017 | DK | 29.11.2017 | EE | 29.11.2017 | ES | 29.11.2017 | FI | 29.11.2017 | HR | 29.11.2017 | IT | 29.11.2017 | LT | 29.11.2017 | LV | 29.11.2017 | MC | 29.11.2017 | MK | 29.11.2017 | MT | 29.11.2017 | NL | 29.11.2017 | PL | 29.11.2017 | PT | 29.11.2017 | RO | 29.11.2017 | RS | 29.11.2017 | SE | 29.11.2017 | SI | 29.11.2017 | SK | 29.11.2017 | SM | 29.11.2017 | TR | 29.11.2017 | IE | 16.12.2017 | LU | 16.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | BG | 28.02.2018 | GB | 28.02.2018 | NO | 28.02.2018 | GR | 01.03.2018 | IS | 29.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 16.12.2011 | |
AT | 29.11.2017 | ||
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
MK | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PT | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 16.12.2017 | ||
LU | 16.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GB | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 16.12.2011 | |
AT | 29.11.2017 | ||
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
MK | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 16.12.2017 | ||
LU | 16.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GB | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 16.12.2011 | |
AT | 29.11.2017 | ||
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
MK | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 16.12.2017 | ||
LU | 16.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GB | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 16.12.2011 | |
AT | 29.11.2017 | ||
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 16.12.2017 | ||
LU | 16.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GB | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 16.12.2017 | ||
LU | 16.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GB | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 16.12.2017 | ||
LU | 16.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
GB | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 16.12.2017 | ||
LU | 16.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 16.12.2017 | ||
LU | 16.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
IE | 16.12.2017 | ||
LU | 16.12.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MT | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.12.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
IT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
ES | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 29.11.2017 | |
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP1191418 (NOKIA CORP [FI]); | [YA]DE10241869 (MARQUARDT GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP1447737 (K TECH DEVICES CORP [JP]); | [XYI]US2009007684 (KURTZ ANTHONY D [US], et al) | by applicant | US4810992 | US5008497 | FR2683649 | EP1429356 | EP1429355 |