EP2643787 - HANDLING ENCODED INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ensygnia IP Limited 20-22 Wenlock Road London N1 7GU / GB | [2024/25] |
Former [2017/03] | For all designated states Ensygnia IP Limited 20-22 Wenlock Road London N1 7GU / GB | ||
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Ensygnia Limited 450 Brook Drive Green Park Reading, Berkshire RG2 6UU / GB | ||
Former [2013/40] | For all designated states Ensygnia Limited 145-157 St. John Street London EC1V 4PW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARRIS, Richard H. 9 Moorlands Close Fleet, Hampshire GU51 3PL / GB | [2013/40] | Representative(s) | Derry, Paul Stefan Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2024/25] |
Former [2013/40] | Hill, Justin John Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | Application number, filing date | 11808911.9 | 25.11.2011 | [2024/25] | WO2011GB52320 | Priority number, date | GB20100020025 | 25.11.2010 Original published format: GB 201020025 | [2013/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012069845 | Date: | 31.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2643787 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2643787 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/40, G06F21/34, G06F21/36, G06F21/43, G06F21/35, // G06Q20/32, G06Q20/40 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
G06Q20/401 (EP,CN,GB,RU,US);
G06F21/34 (EP,CN,RU,US);
G06Q20/00 (GB);
H04L63/10 (US);
G06F16/9554 (EP,RU,US);
G06F21/35 (EP,CN,RU,US);
G06F21/36 (EP,CN,RU,US);
G06F21/43 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q20/3276 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q20/407 (EP,CN,US);
G07C9/38 (GB);
H04L63/08 (US);
H04L63/083 (EP,US);
H04L63/0853 (EP,CN,US);
H04L63/18 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/40] | G06F21/20, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HANDHABUNG VON KODIERTEN INFORMATIONEN | [2013/40] | English: | HANDLING ENCODED INFORMATION | [2013/40] | French: | MANIPULATION D'INFORMATIONS ENCODÉES | [2013/40] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 10.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2015 | Observations by third parties | 26.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 02.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2019 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 02.04.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 02.04.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.04.2024 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 23.06.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 23.06.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.06.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.09.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 21.09.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.09.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.05.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 19.05.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.05.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.02.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 12.02.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.04.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 09.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 09.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.2015 | 30.11.2015 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   18.05.2016 | 30.11.2017 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   20.02.2018 | 30.11.2019 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   21.05.2020 | 30.11.2021 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   09.05.2022 | 30.11.2022 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   19.05.2023 | 30.11.2023 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   09.05.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009241175 (TRANDAL DAVID [US], et al); | [XI]EP2166697 (GMV SOLUCIONES GLOBALES INTERN [ES]); | [A]FR2940580 (LE SOLLEU YANN [FR]); | Examination | US2009288159 |