Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP2596478 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CA2011000819W CN201180041887 EP11809105 IL22429313 US201313743624 US201615015185 US201916242608 US202117340262



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9280860Global Dossier 08.03.2016B2
US2013234825 12.09.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201313743624 17.01.2013
US36551110 19.07.2010
WO2011CA00819 19.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11986287Global Dossier 21.05.2024B2
US2021366219 25.11.2021A1
Priority number Date
US201313743624 17.01.2013
US202117340262 07.06.2021
US36551110 19.07.2010
US201615015185 04.02.2016
US201916242608 08.01.2019
WO2011CA00819 19.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11055944Global Dossier 06.07.2021B2
US2019213811 11.07.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201313743624 17.01.2013
US36551110 19.07.2010
US201615015185 04.02.2016
US201916242608 08.01.2019
WO2011CA00819 19.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10223851Global Dossier 05.03.2019B2
US2016225209 04.08.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201313743624 17.01.2013
US36551110 19.07.2010
US201615015185 04.02.2016
WO2011CA00819 19.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL224293Global Dossier 31.07.2019B
Priority number Date
US36551110 19.07.2010
WO2011CA00819 19.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103119630BGlobal Dossier 23.11.2016B
CN103119630 22.05.2013A
Priority number Date
US36551110 19.07.2010
WO2011CA00819 19.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2596478Global Dossier 04.09.2019B1
EP2596478 03.01.2018A4
EP2596478 29.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
US36551110 19.07.2010
WO2011CA00819 19.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112013001537 24.08.2021B8
BR112013001537 05.01.2021B1
BR112013001537 10.05.2016A2
Priority number Date
US36551110 19.07.2010
WO2011CA00819 19.07.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2012009791Global Dossier 26.01.2012A1
Priority number Date
US36551110 19.07.2010