EP2589015 - EXTRACTING FACTS FROM SOCIAL NETWORK MESSAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.2017 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/17] |
Former [2013/19] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ICKMAN, Steven, W. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
KINSEL, Patrick, A. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
ROBERTON, Nathanael, P. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2013/19] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/19] | Fischer, Michael Maria, et al Olswang Gemany LLP Rosental 4 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11810065.0 | 23.06.2011 | WO2011US41584 | Priority number, date | US20100827070 | 30.06.2010 Original published format: US 827070 | [2013/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012012080 | Date: | 26.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2589015 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/00, G06F17/30 | [2013/19] | CPC: |
G06Q50/01 (EP,US);
G06F16/24575 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Title | German: | EXTRAKTION VON FAKTEN AUS SOCIAL-NETWORK-NACHRICHTEN | [2013/19] | English: | EXTRACTING FACTS FROM SOCIAL NETWORK MESSAGES | [2013/19] | French: | EXTRACTION D'ÉLÉMENTS FACTUELS DE MESSAGES SUR DES RÉSEAUX SOCIAUX | [2013/19] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 06.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/51] | 14.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2009307003 (BENYAMIN DANIEL [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0061] , [0 66] , [0 67]; figures 1, 8 * * abstract *; | [I]US7506263 (JOHNSTON SIMON KURT [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 2, lines 16-32; figure 2 * * column 4, lines 57-67 *; | [I]WO2007142998 (KAAVA CORP [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0003]; figures 1, 18 *; | [A]US2010070593 (SAYERS CRAIG PETER [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0023] , [0049]; figure 1 * * abstract * | International search | [A]US2009162824 (HECK LARRY P [US]); | [A]KR20080038605 (JEONG WOO JIN [KR]); | [A]KR20020010226 (DIGITALHENGE CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]US2009307196 (SHUSTER GARY STEPHEN [US]) |