EP2596328 - COUPLED TORSIONAL RESONATORS VISCOMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baker Hughes Incorporated 2929 Allen Parkway, Suite 2100 Houston, TX 77019-2118 / US | [2013/28] |
Former [2013/27] | For all designated states Viscoteers, Inc. 1020 SW Broadway Drive Portland, OR 97201 / US | ||
Former [2013/22] | For all designated states Goodbread, Joe 1020 SW Broadway Drive Portland, OR 97201 / US | ||
For all designated states Dual, Jürg Küsnachterstrasse 53 8126 Zumikon / CH | |||
For all designated states Sayir, Mahir Steinmuristr. 20 8123 Ebmatingen / CH | |||
For all designated states Häusler, Klaus Sillerwies 10 8053 Zürich / CH | |||
For all designated states Marti, Ueli Bachtobel 12 8184 Bachenbulach / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOODBREAD, Joe 1020 SW Broadway Drive Portland, OR 97201 / US | 02 /
DUAL, Juerg Kusnachterstrasse 53 8126 Zumikon / CH | [2013/22] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | Jeffrey, Philip Michael Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 11810326.6 | 20.07.2011 | WO2011US44645 | Priority number, date | US20100380706P | 07.09.2010 Original published format: US 380706 P | US20100422219P | 13.12.2010 Original published format: US 422219 P | US20100366161P | 21.07.2010 Original published format: US 366161 P | [2013/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012012508 | Date: | 26.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2596328 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N11/16, // G01N9/00 | [2017/02] | CPC: |
G01N9/002 (EP,GB,US);
G01N11/16 (US);
G01N11/162 (EP,GB,US);
G01N29/02 (US);
G01N2009/006 (US)
|
Former IPC [2013/22] | G01N11/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/22] | Title | German: | VISKOSIMETER MIT GEKOPPELTEN VERZERRUNGSRESONATOREN | [2013/22] | English: | COUPLED TORSIONAL RESONATORS VISCOMETER | [2013/22] | French: | VISCOSIMÈTRE À RÉSONATEURS DE TORSION ACCOUPLÉS | [2013/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/22] | 12.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/26] | 23.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.10.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2114745 (BESTOBELL); | [XA]US4920787 (DUAL JURG [CH], et al); | [X]WO2009037050 (ENDRESS & HAUSER GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al); | [XAI]DE102008050326 (ENDRESS & HAUSER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) | International search | [A]US2005262944 (BENNETT JAMES [US], et al); | [A]US2006218996 (MATSIEV LEONID [US], et al); | [A]US2007062260 (WENGER ALFRED [CH], et al) | by applicant | US5837885 |