EP2655303 - HYDROGENATION OF ESTERS OR CARBONYL GROUPS WITH TETRADENTATE AMINO/IMINO-THIOETHER BASED RUTHENIUM COMPLEXES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firmenich SA 1, route des Jeunes P.O. Box 239 1211 Geneva 8 / CH | [2013/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANTORO, Francesco Firmenich SA 1 route des Jeunes CH-1211 Geneva 8 / CH | 02 /
SAUDAN, Lionel Firmenich SA 1 route des Jeunes CH-1211 Geneva 8 / CH | 03 /
SAUDAN, Christophe - deceased / CH | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | Baumgartner Harris, Pauline, et al Firmenich SA Route des Jeunes 1 P.O. Box 239 1211 Genève 8 / CH | [2017/08] |
Former [2013/44] | Carina, Riccardo Filippo, et al FIRMENICH SA Legal Dept., IP Group Route des Jeunes, 1 P.O. Box 239 1211 Geneva 8 / CH | Application number, filing date | 11811015.4 | 19.12.2011 | [2017/08] | WO2011EP73223 | Priority number, date | EP20100196140 | 21.12.2010 Original published format: EP 10196140 | [2013/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012084810 | Date: | 28.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2655303 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2655303 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07C29/145, C07C31/125, C07C33/02, C07C33/025, C07C33/14, C07C33/18, C07C33/20, C07C33/22, C07C33/30, C07C33/34, C07C35/06, C07C35/08, C07C35/23, C07C35/36, C07C323/32, C07C323/45, C07D307/44, C07D317/54, C07F15/00 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
C07C29/145 (EP,US);
C07C37/56 (US);
C07C323/32 (EP,US);
C07C323/45 (EP,US);
C07D307/58 (EP,US);
C07D317/64 (EP,US);
C07F15/0053 (EP,US);
C07B2200/07 (EP,US);
C07C2601/08 (EP,US);
C07C2601/10 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US);
C07C2601/16 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C29/145, C07C31/125 (US,EP);
C07C29/145, C07C33/02 (EP,US);
C07C29/145, C07C33/025 (US,EP);
C07C29/145, C07C33/12 (US,EP);
C07C29/145, C07C33/14 (US,EP);
C07C29/145, C07C33/18 (EP,US);
C07C29/145, C07C33/20 (US,EP);
C07C29/145, C07C33/22 (US,EP);
C07C29/145, C07C33/30 (US,EP);
C07C29/145, C07C33/34 (EP,US);
C07C29/145, C07C35/06 (US,EP);
C07C29/145, C07C35/08 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2013/44] | C07C29/141, C07C29/145, C07C31/125, C07C33/02, C07C33/025, C07C33/12, C07C33/14, C07C33/20, C07C33/30, C07C35/06, C07C35/18, C07C35/23, C07C35/36, C07D307/44, C07D317/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDRIERUNG VON ESTERN ODER CARBONYLGRUPPEN MIT VIERZÄHLIGEN AMINO-/IMINO-THIOEHTER-BASIERTEN RUTHENIUMKOMPLEXEN | [2013/44] | English: | HYDROGENATION OF ESTERS OR CARBONYL GROUPS WITH TETRADENTATE AMINO/IMINO-THIOETHER BASED RUTHENIUM COMPLEXES | [2013/44] | French: | HYDROGÉNATION DE GROUPES ESTERS OU CARBONYLES AVEC DES COMPLEXES DU RUTHÉNIUM À BASE D'AMINO/IMINO-THIOÉTHER TÉTRADENTATE | [2013/44] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 06.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2011 | AL | 22.02.2017 | AT | 22.02.2017 | CY | 22.02.2017 | CZ | 22.02.2017 | DK | 22.02.2017 | EE | 22.02.2017 | FI | 22.02.2017 | HR | 22.02.2017 | IT | 22.02.2017 | LT | 22.02.2017 | LV | 22.02.2017 | MC | 22.02.2017 | MK | 22.02.2017 | NL | 22.02.2017 | PL | 22.02.2017 | RO | 22.02.2017 | RS | 22.02.2017 | SE | 22.02.2017 | SI | 22.02.2017 | SK | 22.02.2017 | SM | 22.02.2017 | TR | 22.02.2017 | BG | 22.05.2017 | NO | 22.05.2017 | GR | 23.05.2017 | IS | 22.06.2017 | PT | 22.06.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 19.12.2011 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MK | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
TR | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 19.12.2011 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MK | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 19.12.2011 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.12.2011 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO0240155 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH], et al) [AD] 1-10 * claim 1; tables 1, 3 *; | [X] - D.A. NATION, ET AL., "Asymmetric copper complexes of stable mono-tert-butyl monobenzyl dithioether N2S2 ligands", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, DALTON TRANSACTIONS, Royal Society of Chemistry, Cambridge, GB, (1996), no. 14, doi:10.1039/dt9960003001, ISSN 1477-9226, pages 3001 - 3009, XP009025876 [X] 9 * compound L2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/dt9960003001 | Examination | - YIZHEN SUN, ET AL., "New multidentate ligands containing mercaptobenzyl functional groups, and biodistribution of gallium-67-TACN-HSB", TETRAHEDRON, Elsevier Science Publishers, Amsterdam, NL, (19990430), vol. 55, no. 18, doi:10.1016/s0040-4020(99)00243-4, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 5733 - 5740, XP004163601 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(99)00243-4 | by applicant | EP0901997 | WO0123088 | WO0222526 | WO0240155 | EP1813621 | WO2008065588 | - YAN-MEI HE ET AL., ORG.BIOMOL.CHEM., (2010), vol. 8, page 2497 | - ANDERSSON, JACS, (2005), vol. 127, page 15083 | - IKARIYA, ORGANOMETALLICS, (2001), vol. 20, page 379 | - SHVO, ORGANOMETALLICS, (1985), vol. 4, page 1459 | - CHAUDRET, J. MOL. CATAL. A. CHEM., (1995), vol. 98, page L5 | - D.SCOTT BOHLE ET AL., INORG.CHEM., (2000), vol. 39, page 712 | - D.A. NATION, J. CHEM. SOC. DALTON TRANS., (1996), page 3001 | - NAKAJIMA, K.; ANDO, Y.; MANO, H.; KOJIMA, M., INORG. CHIM. ACTA, (1998), vol. 274, page 184 | - J. POWELL ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC., (1968), page 159 | - M.O. ALBERS ET AL., INORGANIC SYNTH., (1989), vol. 26, page 249 | - R.R. SCHROCK ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC. DALTON TRANS., (1974), page 951 |