EP2598631 - RECOMBINANT BACTERIUM AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Research Council of Canada 1200 Montreal Road Ottawa, Ontario K1A 0R6 / CA | [2013/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAD, Subash 1793 Heatherstone Crescent Ottawa, ON K4A 4P2 / CA | 02 /
KRISHNAN, Lakshmi 1793 Heatherstone Crescent Ottawa, ON K4A 4P2 / CA | 03 /
TZELEPIS, Fanny 43 Spadina Av., Apt. 1 Ottawa Ontario K1Y 2B8 / CA | 04 /
ALCON, Valeria 370 Metcalfe Street Apt. 404 Ottawa, ON K2P 1S9 / CA | 05 /
YOUNG, Kevin G. 1420 Randall Avenue Ottawa Ontario K1H 7R7 / CA | [2013/23] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Andrea, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechsanwälte Steinerstraße 15/Haus A 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | Fleuchaus, Andrea, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Steinerstrasse 15/A 81369 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/23] | Fleuchaus, Andrea, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Steinerstrasse 15/A 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11811675.5 | 28.07.2011 | [2019/15] | WO2011CA00848 | Priority number, date | US20100368346P | 28.07.2010 Original published format: US 368346 P | [2013/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012012872 | Date: | 02.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2598631 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2598631 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 02.02.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/21, A61K39/295, A61P31/04, A61P31/12, A61P37/04, C12N15/00, C12N15/74, C07K14/255, C07K19/00 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
C07K14/77 (EP,US);
A61K2239/31 (EP,US);
A61K2239/38 (EP,US);
A61K39/0005 (US);
A61K39/0011 (EP,US);
A61K39/001106 (EP,US);
A61K39/001156 (EP,US);
A61K39/001186 (EP,US);
A61K39/001191 (EP,US);
A61K39/001192 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,US);
A61K39/4644 (EP,US);
A61K39/464832 (EP,US);
A61K39/464838 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K14/195 (EP,US);
C07K14/4713 (EP,US);
C07K14/4748 (EP,US);
C07K14/70596 (EP,US);
C07K14/71 (EP,US);
C12N1/20 (EP,US);
C12N9/0059 (EP,US);
C12N9/2462 (EP,US);
C12N9/6494 (EP,US);
C12Y110/03001 (EP,US);
C12Y304/24011 (EP,US);
A61K2039/522 (EP,US);
A61K2039/523 (EP,US);
C07K2319/036 (EP,US);
C07K2319/35 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REKOMBINANTES BAKTERIUM UND SEINE VERWENDUNG | [2013/23] | English: | RECOMBINANT BACTERIUM AND USES THEREOF | [2013/23] | French: | BACTÉRIE RECOMBINANTE ET SES UTILISATIONS | [2013/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 01.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.10.2018 | 05.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/12] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.11.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 23.11.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.12.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.07.2011 | AL | 10.04.2019 | AT | 10.04.2019 | CY | 10.04.2019 | CZ | 10.04.2019 | DK | 10.04.2019 | EE | 10.04.2019 | ES | 10.04.2019 | FI | 10.04.2019 | HR | 10.04.2019 | IT | 10.04.2019 | LT | 10.04.2019 | LV | 10.04.2019 | MC | 10.04.2019 | MK | 10.04.2019 | MT | 10.04.2019 | NL | 10.04.2019 | PL | 10.04.2019 | RO | 10.04.2019 | RS | 10.04.2019 | SE | 10.04.2019 | SI | 10.04.2019 | SK | 10.04.2019 | SM | 10.04.2019 | TR | 10.04.2019 | BG | 10.07.2019 | NO | 10.07.2019 | GR | 11.07.2019 | IE | 28.07.2019 | LU | 28.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | IS | 10.08.2019 | PT | 10.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 28.07.2011 | |
AL | 10.04.2019 | ||
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CY | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
MT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IE | 28.07.2019 | ||
LU | 28.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 28.07.2011 | |
AL | 10.04.2019 | ||
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CY | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IE | 28.07.2019 | ||
LU | 28.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CY | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IE | 28.07.2019 | ||
LU | 28.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IE | 28.07.2019 | ||
LU | 28.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
LU | 28.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 10.04.2019 | |
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 10.04.2019 | |
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 10.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9853854 (UNIV NEW YORK STATE RES FOUND [US]); | [A]WO2006137836 (RES DEV FOUNDATION [US], et al); | [X]CN101204584 (BEIJING NACK CHANGJIN INTERNAT [CN]); | International search | [X]WO2007044406 (LUDWIG INST CANCER RES [US], et al); |