EP2600167 - RADAR APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/14] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
Former [2013/23] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUKAI, Hirohito c/oPanasonic Corporation IP Center IP Development Group 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
KISHIGAMI, Takaaki c/oPanasonic Corporation IP Center IP Development Group 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
NAKAGAWA, Yoichi c/oPanasonic Corporation IP Center IP Development Group 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2013/23] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11811966.8 | 03.06.2011 | WO2011JP03145 | Priority number, date | JP20100169293 | 28.07.2010 Original published format: JP 2010169293 | [2013/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012014359 | Date: | 02.02.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2600167 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.02.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/34, G01S7/292, G01S13/02, G01S7/28, G01S13/42 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
G01S7/34 (EP,US);
G01S13/0209 (EP,US);
G01S13/42 (EP,US);
G01S7/28 (EP,US);
G01S7/2922 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/23] | G01S7/34, G01S7/02, G01S7/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/23] | Title | German: | RADARVORRICHTUNG | [2013/23] | English: | RADAR APPARATUS | [2013/23] | French: | APPAREIL RADAR | [2013/23] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2013 | Translation filed | 25.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 13.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/32] | 23.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5311184 (KUNTMAN DARYAL [US]) [X] 1-4,10 * column 1, line 8 - column 2, line 66; figures 1, 2 * [I] 5-9; | [A]EP1630571 (TDK CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0031] , [0034] , [0037]; figure 3 *; | [A]US2007216567 (IKEDA HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0036] , [0044] , [0045]; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US3659290 (BOURQUE EDWARD L) [A] 1 * column 2, line 6 - line 27 * | International search | [A]JP2006064644 (TDK CORP.); | [A]JPH11118943 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORP.); | [A]JPH0227285 (KODEN ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.); | [A]JP2001136097 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.); | [A]JP2009273053 (FUJITSU LTD.); | [A]JPH06284022 (KYOCERA CORP.); | [A]JPH0927723 (HITACHI, LTD.) |