EP2600329 - EXTERNAL ENVIRONMENT RECOGNITION DEVICE FOR VEHICLE, AND LIGHT DISTRIBUTION CONTROL SYSTEM USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Automotive Systems, Ltd. 2520, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | [2013/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGATA Takehito c/o Hitachi Research Laboratory HITACHI, LTD. 1-1 Omikacho 7-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 319-1292 / JP | 02 /
OTSUKA Yuji c/o HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS, LTD. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | 03 /
OHTSUJI Shinya c/o HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS, LTD. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | [2016/36] |
Former [2013/23] | 01 /
OGATA Takehito c/o Hitachi Research Laboratory HITACHI LTD. 1-1 Omikacho 7-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 319-1292 / JP | ||
02 /
OTSUKA Yuji c/o HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | |||
03 /
OHTSUJI Shinya c/o HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2016/36] |
Former [2013/23] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11812326.4 | 20.07.2011 | [2016/36] | WO2011JP66399 | Priority number, date | JP20100171302 | 30.07.2010 Original published format: JP 2010171302 | [2013/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012014735 | Date: | 02.02.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2600329 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2600329 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.02.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/16, B60Q1/14, B60R1/00, G06F17/00, G06K9/00, G06K9/32 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
B60Q1/143 (EP,US);
G06F17/00 (US);
G06V20/56 (EP,US);
G06V20/582 (EP,US);
G08G1/165 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/056 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/41 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/42 (EP,US);
G06V10/25 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/23] | G08G1/16, B60Q1/14, B60R1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSSENUMGEBUNGSERKENNUNG FÜR FAHRZEUGE UND LICHTVERTEILUNGSSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM DAFÜR | [2013/23] | English: | EXTERNAL ENVIRONMENT RECOGNITION DEVICE FOR VEHICLE, AND LIGHT DISTRIBUTION CONTROL SYSTEM USING SAME | [2013/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RECONNAISSANCE D'ENVIRONNEMENT EXTERNE POUR VÉHICULE ET SYSTÈME DE CONTRÔLE DE RÉPARTITION DE LUMIÈRE METTANT EN OEUVRE CE DISPOSITIF | [2013/23] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2013 | Translation filed | 28.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 30.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.07.2011 | AL | 07.09.2016 | AT | 07.09.2016 | BE | 07.09.2016 | CY | 07.09.2016 | CZ | 07.09.2016 | DK | 07.09.2016 | EE | 07.09.2016 | ES | 07.09.2016 | FI | 07.09.2016 | HR | 07.09.2016 | IT | 07.09.2016 | LT | 07.09.2016 | LV | 07.09.2016 | MC | 07.09.2016 | MK | 07.09.2016 | NL | 07.09.2016 | PL | 07.09.2016 | RO | 07.09.2016 | RS | 07.09.2016 | SE | 07.09.2016 | SI | 07.09.2016 | SK | 07.09.2016 | SM | 07.09.2016 | TR | 07.09.2016 | BG | 07.12.2016 | NO | 07.12.2016 | GR | 08.12.2016 | IS | 07.01.2017 | PT | 09.01.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 20.07.2011 | |
AL | 07.09.2016 | ||
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MK | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 20.07.2011 | |
AL | 07.09.2016 | ||
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 20.07.2011 | |
AL | 07.09.2016 | ||
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 07.09.2016 | |
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 07.09.2016 | |
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 07.09.2016 | |
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 07.09.2016 | |
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 07.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2001037165 (SHIRAI NORIAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 3,4,6 * paragraphs [0049] , [0 60] , [0 61]; figure 4 * [A] 1,2; | [A]US6459387 (KOBAYASHI SHOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0042] - [0044] - [0 97] - [0106] *; | [A]EP1593936 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0051] , [0 89] , [ 104]; figures 1, 13, 20; table 2 *; | [A]US2008024325 (KOBAYASHI KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0022] , [0 23] , [0 25] , [0 28] , [0 56] , [0 57]; figures 1, 3, 5A, 7 *; | [AD]JP2008033676 (DENSO CORP) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [AD]JP2008070999 (HITACHI LTD) [AD] 1-7* the whole document *; | [IY]US2008181461 (SAITO TORU [JP], et al) [I] 1,2,5,7 * paragraphs [0044] , [0053] , [0055] , [0056] , [0065] , [0066] , [0069] , [0071] , [0075] - [0079]; figures 1, 8, 12-15 * [Y] 3,4,6; | [A]US2010091513 (KAMIOKA TAKAHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0041] , [0 42] , [0 49] , [0 54] , [0 84] * | International search | [X]JPH06276524 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [X]JPH06274626 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2008033676 (DENSO CORP); | [A]JP2008040615 (DENSO CORP); | [A]JP2008070999 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2010092422 (DENSO CORP) | by applicant | JP2008033676 | JP2008070999 | JP2010171302 |