EP2599787 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING PEPTIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8315 / JP | [2013/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURUKAWA Shinya c/o AJINOMOTO CO. INC. 1-1 Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 02 /
IMAI Hiroki c/o AJINOMOTO CO. INC. 1-1 Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | [2013/23] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 11812399.1 | 22.07.2011 | WO2011JP66714 | Priority number, date | JP20100167213 | 26.07.2010 Original published format: JP 2010167213 | [2013/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012014809 | Date: | 02.02.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2599787 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.02.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/02 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
C07K1/02 (EP,US);
C07K5/06026 (EP,US);
C07K5/06095 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PEPTIDHERSTELLUNG | [2013/23] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING PEPTIDE | [2013/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN PEPTIDE | [2013/23] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2013 | Translation filed | 11.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 29.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/20] | 17.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.06.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2006149035 (RUDOLPH RAINER [DE], et al) [AD] 1-11* claim 1 * | International search | [X]JP2008537733 (MCGILL UNIVERSITY); | [A]JP2008301829 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE); | [X] - MIAO W. ET AL., "Ionic-liquid-supported synthesis: a novel liquid-phase strategy for organic synthesis", ACC.CHEM.RES., (2006), vol. 39, pages 897 - 908, XP055082093 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ar030252f | [X] - MIAO W. ET AL., "Ionic-liquid-supported peptide synthesis demonstrated by the synthesis of leu5-enkephalin", J.ORG.CHEM., (2005), vol. 70, pages 3251 - 3255, XP002409192 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo050006c | [A] - OHNO H. ET AL., "Amino acid ionic liquids", ACC. CHEM.RES., (2007), vol. 40, pages 1122 - 1129, XP002659263 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/AR700053Z | [A] - FUKUMOTO K. ET AL., "Room temperature ionic liquids from 20 natural amino acids", J.AM. CHEM.SOC., (2005), vol. 127, pages 2398 - 2399, XP008111204 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja043451i | by applicant | JP2008537733 | JP2008301829 | - BIOTECHNOL. PROG., (2000), vol. 16, pages 1129 - 1131 | - ACC. CHEM. RES., (2007), vol. 40, pages 1122 - 1129 |