EP2598881 - METHODS FOR PREDICTING RISK OF STROKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the University of Illinois 352 Henry Administration Building 506 South Wright Street Urbana, IL 61801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the University of Illinois 52 Henry Administration Building 506 South Wright Street Urbana, Illinois 61801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUDLEY, Samuel 25 East Superior Street, 3002 Chicago, IL 60611 / US | 02 /
NEGI, Smita 6565 Fannin St. Suite B160 Houston, TX 77030 / US | [2013/23] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2013/34] | Bassett, Richard Simon Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2013/23] | Pilkington, Stephanie Joan Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 11813253.9 | 29.07.2011 | WO2011US45903 | Priority number, date | US20100368941P | 29.07.2010 Original published format: US 368941 P | [2013/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012016150 | Date: | 02.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2598881 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
G01N33/6896 (EP,US);
G01N33/6893 (US);
A61P7/02 (EP);
G01N2333/4737 (EP,US);
G01N2800/2871 (EP,US);
G01N2800/52 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VORHERSAGE EINES SCHLAGANFALLRISIKOS | [2013/23] | English: | METHODS FOR PREDICTING RISK OF STROKE | [2013/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉDICTION DU RISQUE D'ACCIDENT VASCULAIRE CÉRÉBRAL | [2013/23] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 03.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/11] | 25.10.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.11.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YP] - UEMURA TAKASHI ET AL, "Analysis of the Relation between Oxidative Stress Level and Thrombotic Risk Stratified by CHADS(2) Score in Atrial Fibrillation", CIRCULATION, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, US, (20101123), vol. 122, no. 21, suppl, ISSN 0009-7322, page A13912, XP009178575 [YP] 1-11 * the whole document * | [Y] - MARK A CRANDALL ET AL, "Contemporary Management of Atrial Fibrillation: Update on Anticoagulation and Invasive Management Strategies", MAYO CLIN PROC, United States, (20090701), pages 643 - 662, XP055123966 [Y] 1-11 * p.649 col.1 last par. * | [A] - HUGHES E ET AL, "P992 Raised plasma levels of interleukin-6 predict stroke or adverse outcome in atrial fibrillation agauD.S.G. Conway", EUROPEAN HEART JOURNAL, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, GB, (20030301), vol. 24, no. 5, doi:10.1016/S0195-668X(03)94284-9, ISSN 0195-668X, page 169, XP004529441 [A] 1-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0195-668X(03)94284-9 | International search | [A]US2007218457 (MCKIM JAMES M [US]); | [Y]US2008033258 (DUDLEY SAMUEL C [US], et al); | [A]US2009325163 (HELGADOTTIR ANNA [IS], et al); | [Y] - PAMUKCU ET AL., "Simplifying stroke risk stratification in atrial fibrillation patients: implications of the Cha.sub.2DS.sub.2VASc risk stratification scores", AGE AND AGEING, (20100526), vol. 39, pages 533 - 535, XP055096619 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/ageing/afq059 | [Y] - PUWANANT ET AL., "Role of the CHADS2 score in the evaluation of thromboembolic risk in patients with atrial fibrillation undergoing transesophageal echocardiography before pulmonary vein isolation", J AM COLL CARDIOL., (2009), vol. 54, no. 22, pages 2032 - 2039, XP026764515 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jacc.2009.07.037 |