EP2656588 - COMPONENT, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING COMMUNICATION OF DATA OF AT LEAST ONE APPLICATION OF A COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2013/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESPINA PEREZ, Javier c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
GÖRGEN, Daniel Martin c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
AOUN, Marc c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
SCHENK, Tim Corneel Wilhelmus c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
GARCIA MORCHON, Oscar c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus Signify Netherlands B.V. Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 11813415.4 | 21.12.2011 | WO2011IB55837 | Priority number, date | EP20100196411 | 22.12.2010 Original published format: EP 10196411 | [2013/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012085850 | Date: | 28.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2656588 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04L12/56 | [2013/44] | CPC: |
H04L47/24 (EP,US);
H04L47/10 (EP,US);
H04L47/12 (US);
H04L47/266 (EP,US);
H04L67/125 (EP,US);
H04L67/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAUTEIL, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER DATENKOMMUNIKATION VON MINDESTENS EINER ANWENDUNG EINES KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZES | [2013/44] | English: | COMPONENT, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING COMMUNICATION OF DATA OF AT LEAST ONE APPLICATION OF A COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK | [2013/44] | French: | COMPOSANT, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR RÉGULER LA COMMUNICATION DE DONNÉES D'AU MOINS UNE APPLICATION D'UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION | [2013/44] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 13.01.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2002087723 (WILLIAMS ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,11-14 * paragraphs [0055] - [0061] * [I] 7,9,10,15; | [XI]EP1489792 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-6,8,11-14 * paragraphs [0034] - [0043]; figure 2 * [I] 7,9,10,15; | [XI]US2006092837 (KWAN BRUCE H [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,11-14 * paragraphs [0054] - [0056] *[I] 7,9,10,15 | by applicant | US2002087723 | EP1489792 | US2006092837 | US2006187836 |