EP2647315 - PANEL TYPE CURTAIN AND METHOD FOR CONNECTING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kazuma CO., LTD. 105 Yaemaki-cho Fukui-shi Fukui 910-0123 / JP | [2013/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAZUMA, Kuniharu c/o KAZUMA CO. LTD. 105 Yaemaki-cho Fukui-shi Fukui 910-0123 / JP | [2013/41] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/48] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/41] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11813644.9 | 10.06.2011 | [2016/48] | WO2011JP03323 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012168987 | Date: | 13.12.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2647315 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2647315 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.12.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A47H13/00, A47H1/08 | [2014/27] | CPC: |
A47H15/04 (EP,US);
A47H1/00 (EP,US);
A47H13/04 (EP,US);
A47H2001/047 (EP,US);
A47H2023/025 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/41] | A47H13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLATTENARTIGER VORHANG UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER ANBRINGUNG | [2013/41] | English: | PANEL TYPE CURTAIN AND METHOD FOR CONNECTING SAME | [2013/41] | French: | RIDEAU DE TYPE PANNEAU ET PROCÉDÉ DE FIXATION ASSOCIÉ | [2013/41] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2012 | Translation filed | 30.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2012 | Examination requested [2013/41] | 23.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.06.2011 | AL | 30.11.2016 | AT | 30.11.2016 | BE | 30.11.2016 | CY | 30.11.2016 | CZ | 30.11.2016 | DK | 30.11.2016 | EE | 30.11.2016 | ES | 30.11.2016 | FI | 30.11.2016 | HR | 30.11.2016 | IT | 30.11.2016 | LT | 30.11.2016 | LV | 30.11.2016 | MC | 30.11.2016 | MK | 30.11.2016 | NL | 30.11.2016 | PL | 30.11.2016 | RO | 30.11.2016 | RS | 30.11.2016 | SE | 30.11.2016 | SI | 30.11.2016 | SK | 30.11.2016 | SM | 30.11.2016 | BG | 28.02.2017 | NO | 28.02.2017 | GR | 01.03.2017 | IS | 30.03.2017 | PT | 30.03.2017 | GB | 10.06.2017 | IE | 10.06.2017 | LU | 10.06.2017 | MT | 10.06.2017 | TR | 10.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | FR | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | [2024/42] |
Former [2020/33] | HU | 10.06.2011 | |
AL | 30.11.2016 | ||
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MK | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IS | 30.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
GB | 10.06.2017 | ||
IE | 10.06.2017 | ||
LU | 10.06.2017 | ||
MT | 10.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 10.06.2011 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MK | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
GB | 10.06.2017 | ||
IE | 10.06.2017 | ||
LU | 10.06.2017 | ||
MT | 10.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 10.06.2011 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
GB | 10.06.2017 | ||
IE | 10.06.2017 | ||
LU | 10.06.2017 | ||
MT | 10.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 10.06.2011 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
GB | 10.06.2017 | ||
IE | 10.06.2017 | ||
LU | 10.06.2017 | ||
MT | 10.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
GB | 10.06.2017 | ||
IE | 10.06.2017 | ||
LU | 10.06.2017 | ||
MT | 10.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
GB | 10.06.2017 | ||
IE | 10.06.2017 | ||
LU | 10.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
GB | 10.06.2017 | ||
IE | 10.06.2017 | ||
LU | 10.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
GB | 10.06.2017 | ||
LU | 10.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 30.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US7270165 (CHUANG SHAN-CHI [TW]) [X] 1,3,4,6 * column 2, lines 51-57; figures 1,3,4,6,9 * * column 2, lines 63-65 * [A] 2; | [A]WO2004048738 (HINNO AG [CH], et al) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [A]US7174944 (CLARK MIKE [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH017831Y (NICHIBEI CO., LTD.) |