EP2661849 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DISTRIBUTING MEANINGFUL CLINICAL ALERTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2013/46] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROSS, Brian, David c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
LAGOR, Charles c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
WEISS, David, Warren c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
PATTILLO, Monroe, Wyatt c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
PORTERFIELD, Robert, Duane c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 06 /
GOSSE, Redvers, Curtis c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2013/46] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2019/22] | Steffen, Thomas Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2013/46] | Steffen, Thomas Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 11813821.3 | 21.12.2011 | [2019/22] | WO2011IB55858 | Priority number, date | US201161429779P | 05.01.2011 Original published format: US 201161429779 P | US201161532835P | 09.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161532835 P | [2013/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012093307 | Date: | 12.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2661849 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2661849 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/58, H04L12/18 | [2013/46] | CPC: |
H04L12/1895 (EP,US);
H04L12/18 (RU);
H04L51/00 (US);
G16H40/20 (EP,US);
H04L12/1877 (RU);
H04L12/1881 (RU);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERTEILUNG VON SINNVOLLEN KLINISCHEN WARNUNGEN | [2019/01] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DISTRIBUTING MEANINGFUL CLINICAL ALERTS | [2013/46] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DISTRIBUER DES ALERTES CLINIQUES SENSÉES | [2019/01] |
Former [2013/46] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERTEILUNG VON BEDEUTSAMEN KLINISCHEN ALARMEN | ||
Former [2013/46] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DISTRIBUTION D'ALERTES CLINIQUES SIGNIFICATIVES | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/46] | 12.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.12.2018 | 06.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2011 | AL | 29.05.2019 | AT | 29.05.2019 | CY | 29.05.2019 | CZ | 29.05.2019 | DK | 29.05.2019 | EE | 29.05.2019 | ES | 29.05.2019 | FI | 29.05.2019 | HR | 29.05.2019 | IT | 29.05.2019 | LT | 29.05.2019 | LV | 29.05.2019 | MC | 29.05.2019 | MK | 29.05.2019 | MT | 29.05.2019 | NL | 29.05.2019 | PL | 29.05.2019 | RO | 29.05.2019 | RS | 29.05.2019 | SE | 29.05.2019 | SI | 29.05.2019 | SK | 29.05.2019 | SM | 29.05.2019 | TR | 29.05.2019 | BG | 29.08.2019 | NO | 29.08.2019 | GR | 30.08.2019 | IS | 29.09.2019 | PT | 30.09.2019 | GB | 21.12.2019 | IE | 21.12.2019 | LU | 21.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | CH | 31.12.2019 | LI | 31.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 21.12.2011 | |
AL | 29.05.2019 | ||
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
MT | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
GB | 21.12.2019 | ||
IE | 21.12.2019 | ||
LU | 21.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 21.12.2011 | |
AL | 29.05.2019 | ||
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
GB | 21.12.2019 | ||
IE | 21.12.2019 | ||
LU | 21.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
GB | 21.12.2019 | ||
IE | 21.12.2019 | ||
LU | 21.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
GB | 21.12.2019 | ||
IE | 21.12.2019 | ||
LU | 21.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
GB | 21.12.2019 | ||
IE | 21.12.2019 | ||
LU | 21.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
GB | 21.12.2019 | ||
IE | 21.12.2019 | ||
LU | 21.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
IE | 21.12.2019 | ||
LU | 21.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 29.05.2019 | |
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 29.05.2019 | |
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | Cited in | International search | [I]WO0127759 (I2 TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [I] 1-20 * page 2, line 3 - page 10, line 22 *; | [A]US2006047538 (CONDURSO JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [IA]US7684548 (RODKEY RYAN SCOTT [US], et al) [I] 1,8,9,14-16,20 * column 2, line 15 - column 12, line 22 * [A] 2-7,10-13,17-19 | by applicant | WO0127759 | US7684548 |