EP2601105 - VIAL PREPARATION METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hospira Australia Pty Ltd Level 3, 500 Collins Street Melbourne, Victoria 3000 / AU | [2013/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WENSLEY, Emma J Apartment 834 1300 South White Oak Drive Waukegan, Illinois 60085 / US | 02 /
KNILL, Andrew Malcolm 58 Davies Road Bittern Victoria 3918 / AU | 03 /
SUENDERMANN, John Fredric 2/77 Paxton Street Malvern East Victoria 3145 / AU | [2013/24] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Johnson, Yvonne Catherine Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11813965.8 | 05.08.2011 | [2017/41] | WO2011AU01013 | Priority number, date | US201161434928P | 21.01.2011 Original published format: US 201161434928 P | US20100371318P | 06.08.2010 Original published format: US 371318 P | [2013/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012016301 | Date: | 09.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2601105 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2601105 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 09.02.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65B31/02, B65D47/32, B65B7/28, B01L3/00, B65B3/00, B65B7/00, F26B5/06, B65D39/00, B65D81/20 | [2014/03] | CPC: |
B65B3/003 (EP,KR,US);
B65B31/027 (EP,KR,US);
B65D47/32 (CN);
B65B7/00 (US);
B01L3/5082 (KR,US);
B65B31/02 (CN);
B65B7/2821 (EP,KR,US);
B65D39/0023 (EP,KR,US);
B65D81/2076 (EP,KR,US);
F26B5/06 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/24] | B65B31/02, B65D47/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/24] | Extension states | BA | 26.02.2013 | ME | 26.02.2013 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PHIOLEN | [2013/24] | English: | VIAL PREPARATION METHOD AND SYSTEM | [2013/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE PRÉPARATION DE FLACONS | [2013/24] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/24] | 18.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17166230.7 / EP3208202 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 11.10.2017 | HR | 11.10.2017 | LT | 11.10.2017 | LV | 11.10.2017 | MC | 11.10.2017 | MK | 11.10.2017 | RS | 11.10.2017 | SM | 11.10.2017 | NO | 11.01.2018 | IS | 11.02.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HR | 11.10.2017 | |
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
MK | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | HR | 11.10.2017 | |
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | HR | 11.10.2017 | |
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | HR | 11.10.2017 | |
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | LT | 11.10.2017 | |
NO | 11.01.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]WO2006002122 (ANAZAOHEALTH CORP [US], et al) [I] 13,15 * paragraphs [0034] , [0 38] , [0 48] , [ 51] - [0054] - [0 83] * [Y] 1-12,14; | [Y]US2007062162 (LEHMANN MARTIN [CH]) [Y] 1-12,14 * figure 4 ** paragraphs [0011] , [0 17] , [0 18] , [0 24] - [0027] - [0 37] - [0038] - [0 42] , [0 43] , [0 47] , [0 52] , [0 58] , [0 62] * | International search | [X]US3025991 (GILLON JAMES H); | [X]WO2006002122 (ANAZAOHEALTH CORP [US], et al); | [Y]US2007062162 (LEHMANN MARTIN [CH]); | [X]AU2006319012 (BIOCORP RECH ET DEVELOPPEMENT [FR]) | by applicant | WO2006002122 |