EP2598603 - SOIL STABILIZER CONTAINING CARBONACEOUS MATERIAL AND METHODS FOR USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Board of Regents, The University of Texas System 3925 W. Braker Lane Suite 1.9A, MCC Building Austin, TX 78759 / US | [2013/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YILDIRIM, Yetkin 2410 Wood Chase Trail Austin, TX 78728 / US | [2013/23] | Representative(s) | Arth, Hans-Lothar ABK Patent Attorneys Jasminweg 9 14052 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Arth, Hans-Lothar ABK Patent Attorneys Jasminweg 9 14052 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 11814927.7 | 08.04.2011 | WO2011US31796 | Priority number, date | US201161472501P | 06.04.2011 Original published format: US 201161472501 P | US20100367601P | 26.07.2010 Original published format: US 367601 P | [2013/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012018416 | Date: | 09.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2598603 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C09K17/40, C09K17/02 | [2017/35] | CPC: |
C09K17/40 (EP,US);
C08K3/04 (US);
C09K17/02 (EP,US);
E01C21/00 (US);
E01C3/04 (EP,US);
E01C7/36 (EP,US);
E02D3/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/23] | C09K17/14, C09K103/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/23] | Title | German: | BODENSTABILISIERER MIT EINEM KOHLENSTOFFHALTIGEN MATERIAL UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2013/23] | English: | SOIL STABILIZER CONTAINING CARBONACEOUS MATERIAL AND METHODS FOR USING SAME | [2013/23] | French: | STABILISATEUR DE SOL CONTENANT UNE MATIÈRE CARBONÉE ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION CORRESPONDANTS | [2013/23] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 15.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/15] | 28.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004111968 (DAY DANNY MARSHAL [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XA]WO2004090080 (AQUAFUEL RES LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-7,10-13,15 * claims 1-3,10 * [A] 8,9,14; | [A]US2010162780 (SCHARF GERALD C [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4391926 (CREYF HUBERT S [BE]); | [A]US4464200 (DUVAL HENRY H [US]); | [X]US4545820 (MALLOW WILLIAM A [US]); | [A]US5670567 (LAHALIH SHAWQUI M [SA]); | [A]US5746546 (HUBBS JONATHAN W [US], et al); | [A]KR20060121448 (THA HO CO LTD [KR]) |