EP2600900 - MULTIPLEXED SUPRAMOLECULAR ASSEMBLIES FOR NON-VIRAL DELIVERY OF GENETIC MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the University of Illinois 352 Henry Administration Building 506 South Wright Street Urbana, IL 61801 / US | [2013/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Jianjun 2304 Lynwood Drive Champaign Illinois 61821 / US | 02 /
GABRIELSON, Nathan 1101 James Avenue Rockford Illinois 61107 / US | 03 /
LICHEN, Yin 502 W Main Street Apt. 229 Urbana Illinois 61801 / US | [2013/24] | Representative(s) | Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 JJ Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Wilkinson, Marc George, et al Avidity IP Kestrel House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11815380.8 | 05.08.2011 | WO2011US46791 | Priority number, date | US20100371618P | 06.08.2010 Original published format: US 371618 P | [2013/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012019121 | Date: | 09.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2600900 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.05.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K48/00 | [2013/24] | CPC: |
C12N15/87 (EP,US);
A61K48/0025 (US);
A61K31/7088 (EP,US);
A61K47/18 (EP,US);
A61K47/183 (EP,US);
A61K48/0033 (US);
A61K48/0041 (US);
A61K9/1075 (EP,US);
A61K9/5123 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/24] | Title | German: | SUPRAMOLEKULARE MULTIPLEX-AGGREGATE ZUR NICHT-VIRALEN AUSGABE EINES GENETISCHEN MATERIALS | [2013/24] | English: | MULTIPLEXED SUPRAMOLECULAR ASSEMBLIES FOR NON-VIRAL DELIVERY OF GENETIC MATERIAL | [2013/24] | French: | ASSEMBLAGES SUPRAMOLÉCULAIRES MULTIPLEXES POUR ADMINISTRATION NON VIRALE DE MATÉRIEL GÉNÉTIQUE | [2013/24] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 19.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/24] | 10.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/32] | 31.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/32] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 10.09.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 10.09.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.09.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2009079635 (ALCON RES LTD [US], et al) [Y] 5 * page 5, line 13 - line 24 *; | [XY]US2010015218 (JADHAV VASANT [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6-9,12-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraphs [0154] , [0176] * * paragraphs [0542] , [0609] , [0629] * * claim all * [Y] 3-5; | [Y] - KIM T H ET AL, "Receptor-mediated gene delivery using chemically modified chitosan", BIOMEDICAL MATERIALS, (20070901), vol. 2, no. 3, doi:10.1088/1748-6041/2/3/S02, ISSN 1748-605X, pages S95 - S100, XP020125630 [Y] 3,4 * abstract * * figure 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/1748-6041/2/3/S02 | [Y] - HU-LIN JIANG ET AL, "Efficient gene delivery using chitosan-polyethylenimine hybrid systems", BIOMEDICAL MATERIALS, (20080601), vol. 3, no. 2, ISSN 1748-605X, page 25013, XP020140076 [Y] 3,4 * abstract * | [XP] - GABRIELSON N P ET AL, "Multiplexed supramolecular self-assembly for non-viral gene delivery", BIOMATERIALS, vol. 31, no. 34, ISSN 0142-9612, (20101201), pages 9117 - 9127, (20101001), XP027381076 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - SUTAPA BARUA ET AL, "Parallel Synthesis and Screening of Polymers for Nonviral Gene Delivery", MOLECULAR PHARMACEUTICS, (20090202), vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1021/mp800151j, ISSN 1543-8384, pages 86 - 97, XP055144576 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/mp800151j | International search | [Y]US2001007666 (HOFFMAN ALLAN S [US], et al); | [X]US2010015218 (JADHAV VASANT [US], et al) |