Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013022801 | ![]() | 14.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161515832 | 05.08.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012019176 | ![]() | 25.04.2013 | A8 | WO2012019176 | 05.04.2012 | A3 | WO2012019176 | 09.02.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US37113610 | 05.08.2010 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US40736110 | 27.10.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US40693410 | 26.10.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010088548 | ![]() | 05.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26171709 | 16.11.2009 | US17488709 | 01.05.2009 | US29928210 | 28.01.2010 | US28483209 | 24.12.2009 | US14837509 | 29.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2025064634 | ![]() | 27.02.2025 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US202318470282 | 19.09.2023 | US202418652633 | 01.05.2024 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US201514713505 | 15.05.2015 | US201161499095 | 20.06.2011 | WO2011US46812 | 05.08.2011 | US201161495251 | 09.06.2011 | US201715840965 | 13.12.2017 | US201161504038 | 01.07.2011 | US201916386854 | 17.04.2019 | US201161501021 | 24.06.2011 | US201161495718 | 10.06.2011 | US201313814461 | 14.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023338282 | ![]() | 26.10.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715807396 | 08.11.2017 | US26171709 | 16.11.2009 | US201313831695 | 15.03.2013 | US202318187898 | 22.03.2023 | US201514973311 | 17.12.2015 | US69667810 | 29.01.2010 | US17488709 | 01.05.2009 | US201314080700 | 14.11.2013 | US29928210 | 28.01.2010 | US28483209 | 24.12.2009 | US14837509 | 29.01.2009 | US202016842059 | 07.04.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021196510 | ![]() | 01.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26171709 | 16.11.2009 | US37113610 | 05.08.2010 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US40736110 | 27.10.2010 | US69667810 | 29.01.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US40693410 | 26.10.2010 | US28483209 | 24.12.2009 | US14837509 | 29.01.2009 | US201514753574 | 29.06.2015 | US17488709 | 01.05.2009 | US201113204638 | 05.08.2011 | US29928210 | 28.01.2010 | US201414147390 | 03.01.2014 | US202017016953 | 10.09.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9851351 | ![]() | 26.12.2017 | B2 | US2016101046 | 14.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26171709 | 16.11.2009 | US201313831695 | 15.03.2013 | US201514973311 | 17.12.2015 | US69667810 | 29.01.2010 | US17488709 | 01.05.2009 | US201314080700 | 14.11.2013 | US29928210 | 28.01.2010 | US28483209 | 24.12.2009 | US14837509 | 29.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9861521 | ![]() | 09.01.2018 | B2 | US2015250647 | 10.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161504038 | 01.07.2011 | US201161501021 | 24.06.2011 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US201514713505 | 15.05.2015 | US201161499095 | 20.06.2011 | WO2011US46812 | 05.08.2011 | US201161495718 | 10.06.2011 | US201161495251 | 09.06.2011 | US201313814461 | 14.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9066779 | ![]() | 30.06.2015 | B2 | US2014121609 | 01.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26171709 | 16.11.2009 | US37113610 | 05.08.2010 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US40736110 | 27.10.2010 | US69667810 | 29.01.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US40693410 | 26.10.2010 | US28483209 | 24.12.2009 | US14837509 | 29.01.2009 | US17488709 | 01.05.2009 | US201113204638 | 05.08.2011 | US29928210 | 28.01.2010 | US201414147390 | 03.01.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9417238 | ![]() | 16.08.2016 | B2 | US2014073714 | 13.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26171709 | 16.11.2009 | US201313831695 | 15.03.2013 | US69667810 | 29.01.2010 | US17488709 | 01.05.2009 | US201314080700 | 14.11.2013 | US29928210 | 28.01.2010 | US28483209 | 24.12.2009 | US14837509 | 29.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9492315 | ![]() | 15.11.2016 | B2 | US2013324942 | 05.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37113610 | 05.08.2010 | US201113814464 | 05.08.2011 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | WO2011US46870 | 05.08.2011 | US40736110 | 27.10.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US40693410 | 26.10.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9033911 | ![]() | 19.05.2015 | B2 | US2013324918 | 05.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161504038 | 01.07.2011 | US201161501021 | 24.06.2011 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US201113814461 | 05.08.2011 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US201161499095 | 20.06.2011 | WO2011US46812 | 05.08.2011 | US201161495718 | 10.06.2011 | US201161495251 | 09.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8795712 | ![]() | 05.08.2014 | B2 | US2013245573 | 19.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26171709 | 16.11.2009 | US201313831695 | 15.03.2013 | US69667810 | 29.01.2010 | US17488709 | 01.05.2009 | US201313889339 | 07.05.2013 | US29928210 | 28.01.2010 | US28483209 | 24.12.2009 | US14837509 | 29.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8905963 | ![]() | 09.12.2014 | B2 | US2013245544 | 19.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161504038 | 01.07.2011 | US201161501021 | 24.06.2011 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US201313889328 | 07.05.2013 | US201161499095 | 20.06.2011 | WO2011US46812 | 05.08.2011 | US201161495718 | 10.06.2011 | US201161495251 | 09.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8808727 | ![]() | 19.08.2014 | B2 | US2013204209 | 08.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26171709 | 16.11.2009 | US201313831695 | 15.03.2013 | US69667810 | 29.01.2010 | US17488709 | 01.05.2009 | US29928210 | 28.01.2010 | US28483209 | 24.12.2009 | US14837509 | 29.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8623395 | ![]() | 07.01.2014 | B2 | US2012095439 | 19.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37113610 | 05.08.2010 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US40736110 | 27.10.2010 | US69667810 | 29.01.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US40693410 | 26.10.2010 | US201113204638 | 05.08.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8298578 | ![]() | 30.10.2012 | B2 | US2012029470 | 02.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26171709 | 16.11.2009 | US201113252942 | 04.10.2011 | US69667810 | 29.01.2010 | US17488709 | 01.05.2009 | US29928210 | 28.01.2010 | US28483209 | 24.12.2009 | US14837509 | 29.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8277830 | ![]() | 02.10.2012 | B2 | US2012029445 | 02.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113252998 | 04.10.2011 | US26171709 | 16.11.2009 | US69667810 | 29.01.2010 | US17488709 | 01.05.2009 | US29928210 | 28.01.2010 | US28483209 | 24.12.2009 | US14837509 | 29.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8399006 | ![]() | 19.03.2013 | B2 | US2010255061 | 07.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26171709 | 16.11.2009 | US69667810 | 29.01.2010 | US17488709 | 01.05.2009 | US29928210 | 28.01.2010 | US28483209 | 24.12.2009 | US14837509 | 29.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11786396 | ![]() | 17.10.2023 | B2 | US2019336335 | 07.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161504038 | 01.07.2011 | US201916386854 | 17.04.2019 | US201161501021 | 24.06.2011 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US201514713505 | 15.05.2015 | US201161499095 | 20.06.2011 | WO2011US46812 | 05.08.2011 | US201161495718 | 10.06.2011 | US201161495251 | 09.06.2011 | US201313814461 | 14.08.2013 | US201715840965 | 13.12.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11642310 | ![]() | 09.05.2023 | B2 | US2021025885 | 28.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715807396 | 08.11.2017 | US26171709 | 16.11.2009 | US201313831695 | 15.03.2013 | US201514973311 | 17.12.2015 | US69667810 | 29.01.2010 | US17488709 | 01.05.2009 | US201314080700 | 14.11.2013 | US29928210 | 28.01.2010 | US28483209 | 24.12.2009 | US14837509 | 29.01.2009 | US202016842059 | 07.04.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10813788 | ![]() | 27.10.2020 | B2 | US2015297402 | 22.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26171709 | 16.11.2009 | US37113610 | 05.08.2010 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US40736110 | 27.10.2010 | US69667810 | 29.01.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US40693410 | 26.10.2010 | US28483209 | 24.12.2009 | US14837509 | 29.01.2009 | US201514753574 | 29.06.2015 | US17488709 | 01.05.2009 | US201113204638 | 05.08.2011 | US29928210 | 28.01.2010 | US201414147390 | 03.01.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10656152 | ![]() | 19.05.2020 | B2 | US2018292403 | 11.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715807396 | 08.11.2017 | US26171709 | 16.11.2009 | US201313831695 | 15.03.2013 | US201514973311 | 17.12.2015 | US69667810 | 29.01.2010 | US17488709 | 01.05.2009 | US201314080700 | 14.11.2013 | US29928210 | 28.01.2010 | US28483209 | 24.12.2009 | US14837509 | 29.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10265215 | ![]() | 23.04.2019 | B2 | US2018161202 | 14.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161504038 | 01.07.2011 | US201161501021 | 24.06.2011 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US201514713505 | 15.05.2015 | US201161499095 | 20.06.2011 | WO2011US46812 | 05.08.2011 | US201161495718 | 10.06.2011 | US201161495251 | 09.06.2011 | US201313814461 | 14.08.2013 | US201715840965 | 13.12.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10166142 | ![]() | 01.01.2019 | B2 | US2014358125 | 04.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161515832 | 05.08.2011 | US201214236863 | 03.08.2012 | US69667810 | 29.01.2010 | WO2012US49654 | 03.08.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6263217B | ![]() | 17.01.2018 | B2 | JP2016166208 | 15.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US37113610 | 05.08.2010 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US40736110 | 27.10.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US40693410 | 26.10.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6171036B | ![]() | 26.07.2017 | B2 | JP2016135270 | 28.07.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US26171709 | 16.11.2009 | US17488709 | 01.05.2009 | US29928210 | 28.01.2010 | US28483209 | 24.12.2009 | US14837509 | 29.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5902766B | ![]() | 13.04.2016 | B2 | JP2014217769 | 20.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US26171709 | 16.11.2009 | US17488709 | 01.05.2009 | US29928210 | 28.01.2010 | US28483209 | 24.12.2009 | US14837509 | 29.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5907966B | ![]() | 26.04.2016 | B2 | JP2013536015 | 19.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US37113610 | 05.08.2010 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | WO2011US46870 | 05.08.2011 | US40736110 | 27.10.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US40693410 | 26.10.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6063382B | ![]() | 18.01.2017 | B2 | JP2013532576 | 19.08.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161504038 | 01.07.2011 | US201161501021 | 24.06.2011 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US201161499095 | 20.06.2011 | WO2011US46812 | 05.08.2011 | US201161495718 | 10.06.2011 | US201161495251 | 09.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5577354B | ![]() | 20.08.2014 | B2 | JP2012516224 | 19.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US26171709 | 16.11.2009 | US17488709 | 01.05.2009 | US29928210 | 28.01.2010 | US28483209 | 24.12.2009 | WO2010US22631 | 29.01.2010 | US14837509 | 29.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3960134 | ![]() | 02.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37113610 | 05.08.2010 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | WO2011US46870 | 05.08.2011 | US40736110 | 27.10.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US40693410 | 26.10.2010 | EP11743753 | 05.08.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3861969 | ![]() | 11.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161504038 | 01.07.2011 | US201161501021 | 24.06.2011 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US201161499095 | 20.06.2011 | EP11815388 | 05.08.2011 | WO2011US46812 | 05.08.2011 | US201161495718 | 10.06.2011 | US201161495251 | 09.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2739252 | ![]() | 12.08.2015 | A4 | EP2739252 | 11.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161515832 | 05.08.2011 | WO2012US49654 | 03.08.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2600812 | ![]() | 22.09.2021 | B1 | EP2600812 | 12.06.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US37113610 | 05.08.2010 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | WO2011US46870 | 05.08.2011 | US40736110 | 27.10.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US40693410 | 26.10.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2391419 | ![]() | 12.06.2019 | B1 | EP2391419 | 08.06.2016 | A4 | EP2391419 | 07.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26171709 | 16.11.2009 | US17488709 | 01.05.2009 | US29928210 | 28.01.2010 | US28483209 | 24.12.2009 | WO2010US22631 | 29.01.2010 | US14837509 | 29.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105435338B | ![]() | 26.03.2019 | B | CN105435338 | 30.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161504038 | 01.07.2011 | US201161501021 | 24.06.2011 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US201161499095 | 20.06.2011 | CN201180048628 | 05.08.2011 | US201161495718 | 10.06.2011 | US201161495251 | 09.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103209733B | ![]() | 16.12.2015 | B | CN103209733 | 17.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161504038 | 01.07.2011 | US201161501021 | 24.06.2011 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US201161499095 | 20.06.2011 | WO2011US46812 | 05.08.2011 | US201161495718 | 10.06.2011 | US201161495251 | 09.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103209664 | ![]() | 17.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US37113610 | 05.08.2010 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | WO2011US46870 | 05.08.2011 | US40736110 | 27.10.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US40693410 | 26.10.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2807554 | ![]() | 26.10.2021 | C | CA2807554 | 09.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37113610 | 05.08.2010 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | WO2011US46870 | 05.08.2011 | US40736110 | 27.10.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US40693410 | 26.10.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2807535 | ![]() | 19.03.2019 | C | CA2807535 | 09.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161504038 | 01.07.2011 | US201161501021 | 24.06.2011 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US201161499095 | 20.06.2011 | WO2011US46812 | 05.08.2011 | US201161495718 | 10.06.2011 | US201161495251 | 09.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2757037 | ![]() | 06.08.2019 | C | CA2757037 | 05.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26171709 | 16.11.2009 | US17488709 | 01.05.2009 | US29928210 | 28.01.2010 | US28483209 | 24.12.2009 | WO2010US22631 | 29.01.2010 | US14837509 | 29.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2016202327B | ![]() | 16.11.2017 | B2 | AU2016202327 | 05.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37113610 | 05.08.2010 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US40736110 | 27.10.2010 | AU2016202327 | 13.04.2016 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US40693410 | 26.10.2010 | AU2011285501 | 05.08.2011 | AU2014202862 | 26.05.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2016200097B | ![]() | 02.03.2017 | B2 | AU2016200097 | 04.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161504038 | 01.07.2011 | US201161501021 | 24.06.2011 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | AU2011285545 | 05.08.2011 | US201161499095 | 20.06.2011 | US201161495718 | 10.06.2011 | US201161495251 | 09.06.2011 | AU2014203235 | 13.06.2014 | AU2016200097 | 07.01.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014203235B | ![]() | 08.10.2015 | B2 | AU2014203235 | 10.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161504038 | 01.07.2011 | US201161501021 | 24.06.2011 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | AU2011285545 | 05.08.2011 | US201161499095 | 20.06.2011 | US201161495718 | 10.06.2011 | US201161495251 | 09.06.2011 | AU2014203235 | 13.06.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014202862C | ![]() | 21.07.2016 | C1 | AU2014202862B | 14.01.2016 | B2 | AU2014202862 | 19.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37113610 | 05.08.2010 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US40736110 | 27.10.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US40693410 | 26.10.2010 | AU2011285501 | 05.08.2011 | AU2014202862 | 26.05.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011285545B | ![]() | 13.03.2014 | B2 | AU2011285545 | 07.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161504038 | 01.07.2011 | US201161501021 | 24.06.2011 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US201161499095 | 20.06.2011 | WO2011US46812 | 05.08.2011 | US201161495718 | 10.06.2011 | US201161495251 | 09.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011285501B | ![]() | 27.02.2014 | B2 | AU2011285501 | 07.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37113610 | 05.08.2010 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | WO2011US46870 | 05.08.2011 | US40736110 | 27.10.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US40693410 | 26.10.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010208046B | ![]() | 02.10.2014 | B2 | AU2010208046 | 15.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26171709 | 16.11.2009 | US17488709 | 01.05.2009 | US29928210 | 28.01.2010 | US28483209 | 24.12.2009 | WO2010US22631 | 29.01.2010 | US14837509 | 29.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2600930 | ![]() | 17.02.2021 | B1 | EP2600930 | 18.12.2013 | A4 | EP2600930 | 12.06.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201161504038 | 01.07.2011 | US201161501021 | 24.06.2011 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US201161499095 | 20.06.2011 | WO2011US46812 | 05.08.2011 | US201161495718 | 10.06.2011 | US201161495251 | 09.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3045436 | 05.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26171709 | 16.11.2009 | CA2757037 | 29.01.2010 | US17488709 | 01.05.2009 | US29928210 | 28.01.2010 | US28483209 | 24.12.2009 | US14837509 | 29.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102365109B | 03.06.2015 | B | CN102365109 | 29.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US26171709 | 16.11.2009 | US17488709 | 01.05.2009 | US29928210 | 28.01.2010 | US28483209 | 24.12.2009 | WO2010US22631 | 29.01.2010 | US14837509 | 29.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104887389B | 23.06.2017 | B | CN104887389 | 09.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US26171709 | 16.11.2009 | US17488709 | 01.05.2009 | CN201080014840 | 29.01.2010 | US29928210 | 28.01.2010 | US28483209 | 24.12.2009 | US14837509 | 29.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2600812T | 18.10.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US37113610 | 05.08.2010 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | WO2011US46870 | 05.08.2011 | US40736110 | 27.10.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US40693410 | 26.10.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2600930T | 01.03.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161504038 | 01.07.2011 | US201161501021 | 24.06.2011 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US201161499095 | 20.06.2011 | WO2011US46812 | 05.08.2011 | US201161495718 | 10.06.2011 | US201161495251 | 09.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2747755T | 11.03.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US26171709 | 16.11.2009 | US17488709 | 01.05.2009 | US29928210 | 28.01.2010 | US28483209 | 24.12.2009 | WO2010US22631 | 29.01.2010 | US14837509 | 29.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2888906T | 10.01.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161504038 | 01.07.2011 | US201161501021 | 24.06.2011 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US201161499095 | 20.06.2011 | WO2011US46812 | 05.08.2011 | US201161495718 | 10.06.2011 | US201161495251 | 09.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2894940T | 16.02.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US37113610 | 05.08.2010 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | WO2011US46870 | 05.08.2011 | US40736110 | 27.10.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US40693410 | 26.10.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20210587T | 28.05.2021 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201161504038 | 01.07.2011 | US201161501021 | 24.06.2011 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US201161499095 | 20.06.2011 | EP11815388 | 05.08.2011 | WO2011US46812 | 05.08.2011 | US201161495718 | 10.06.2011 | US201161495251 | 09.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20211909T | 18.03.2022 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US37113610 | 05.08.2010 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | WO2011US46870 | 05.08.2011 | US40736110 | 27.10.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US40693410 | 26.10.2010 | EP11743753 | 05.08.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE057267T | 28.05.2022 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US37113610 | 05.08.2010 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US40736110 | 27.10.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US40693410 | 26.10.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT2600812T | 10.11.2021 | T | Priority number | Date | US37113610 | 05.08.2010 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | WO2011US46870 | 05.08.2011 | US40736110 | 27.10.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US40693410 | 26.10.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT2600930T | 12.04.2021 | T | Priority number | Date | US201161504038 | 01.07.2011 | US201161501021 | 24.06.2011 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US201161499095 | 20.06.2011 | WO2011US46812 | 05.08.2011 | US201161495718 | 10.06.2011 | US201161495251 | 09.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2391419T | 31.12.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US26171709 | 16.11.2009 | US17488709 | 01.05.2009 | EP10736495 | 29.01.2010 | US29928210 | 28.01.2010 | US28483209 | 24.12.2009 | WO2010US22631 | 29.01.2010 | US14837509 | 29.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2600812T | 24.01.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US37113610 | 05.08.2010 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | WO2011US46870 | 05.08.2011 | US40736110 | 27.10.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US40693410 | 26.10.2010 | EP11743753 | 05.08.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2600930T | 06.09.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161504038 | 01.07.2011 | US201161501021 | 24.06.2011 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US201161499095 | 20.06.2011 | EP11815388 | 05.08.2011 | WO2011US46812 | 05.08.2011 | US201161495718 | 10.06.2011 | US201161495251 | 09.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2600812T | 09.11.2021 | T | Priority number | Date | US37113610 | 05.08.2010 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US40736110 | 27.10.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US40693410 | 26.10.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS61601 | 29.04.2021 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201161504038 | 01.07.2011 | US201161501021 | 24.06.2011 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US201161499095 | 20.06.2011 | EP11815388 | 05.08.2011 | WO2011US46812 | 05.08.2011 | US201161495718 | 10.06.2011 | US201161495251 | 09.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS62540 | 31.12.2021 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US37113610 | 05.08.2010 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | WO2011US46870 | 05.08.2011 | US40736110 | 27.10.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US40693410 | 26.10.2010 | EP11743753 | 05.08.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG173167 | 29.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26171709 | 16.11.2009 | US17488709 | 01.05.2009 | US29928210 | 28.01.2010 | US28483209 | 24.12.2009 | WO2010US22631 | 29.01.2010 | US14837509 | 29.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG187730 | 28.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161504038 | 01.07.2011 | US201161501021 | 24.06.2011 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US201161499095 | 20.06.2011 | WO2011US46812 | 05.08.2011 | US201161495718 | 10.06.2011 | US201161495251 | 09.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG2014007389 | 28.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US26171709 | 16.11.2009 | US17488709 | 01.05.2009 | US29928210 | 28.01.2010 | US28483209 | 24.12.2009 | US14837509 | 29.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2600812T | 31.12.2021 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US37113610 | 05.08.2010 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | WO2011US46870 | 05.08.2011 | US40736110 | 27.10.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US40693410 | 26.10.2010 | EP11743753 | 05.08.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2600930T | 31.08.2021 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201161504038 | 01.07.2011 | US201161501021 | 24.06.2011 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US201161499095 | 20.06.2011 | EP11815388 | 05.08.2011 | WO2011US46812 | 05.08.2011 | US201161495718 | 10.06.2011 | US201161495251 | 09.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR201910822T | 21.08.2019 | T4 | Priority number | Date | US14837510 | 28.01.2010 | US28483210 | 28.01.2010 | US26171710 | 28.01.2010 | US29928210 | 28.01.2010 | US17488710 | 28.01.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012019136 | ![]() | 07.06.2012 | A3 | WO2012019136 | 09.02.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201161504038 | 01.07.2011 | US201161501021 | 24.06.2011 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US201161499095 | 20.06.2011 | US201161495718 | 10.06.2011 | US201161495251 | 09.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6326124B | ![]() | 16.05.2018 | B2 | JP2017060862 | 30.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161504038 | 01.07.2011 | US201161501021 | 24.06.2011 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US201161499095 | 20.06.2011 | US201161495718 | 10.06.2011 | US201161495251 | 09.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE054113T | 30.08.2021 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201161504038 | 01.07.2011 | US201161501021 | 24.06.2011 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US201161499095 | 20.06.2011 | US201161495718 | 10.06.2011 | US201161495251 | 09.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2600930T | 22.03.2021 | T | Priority number | Date | US201161504038 | 01.07.2011 | US201161501021 | 24.06.2011 | US37116910 | 05.08.2010 | US37115410 | 05.08.2010 | US201161499095 | 20.06.2011 | US201161495718 | 10.06.2011 | US201161495251 | 09.06.2011 | Type | ![]() | EP3861969 |