EP2604672 - BIOMASS GASIFICATION GAS PURIFICATION SYSTEM AND METHOD, AND METHANOL PRODUCTION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2013/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUKUMOTO, Atsuhiro c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 02 /
MATSUBARA, Wataru c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 03 /
TACHIBANA, Shinya c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 04 /
AKIBA, Toshiya c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 05 /
SHINODA, Katsuhiko c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 06 /
AMARI, Takeshi c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2013/25] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11816350.0 | 03.08.2011 | [2018/01] | WO2011JP67797 | Priority number, date | JP20100179081 | 09.08.2010 Original published format: JP 2010179081 | [2013/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012020684 | Date: | 16.02.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2604672 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2604672 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.02.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/38, C10J3/84, C10K1/00, B01J12/00, C07C1/12, C10K1/02, C10K3/02, C07C29/151 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
C10K1/004 (EP,US);
C07C1/12 (US);
B01J12/00 (US);
C01B3/38 (EP,US);
C07C29/1518 (EP,US);
C10J3/84 (EP,US);
C10K1/02 (EP,US);
C10K1/024 (EP,US);
C10K3/023 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0233 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0445 (EP,US);
C01B2203/061 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1058 (EP,US);
C01B2203/107 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1258 (EP,US);
C01B2203/142 (EP,US);
C01B2203/143 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1619 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1011 (EP,US);
C10J2300/0916 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1665 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1853 (EP,US);
Y02E50/10 (EP,US);
Y02E50/30 (EP,US);
Y02P30/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/1518, C07C31/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/20] | C10K3/02, C10K1/02, C10K3/00, C07C29/151, C10K1/00, B01J12/00, C07C1/12 | ||
Former IPC [2013/25] | C10K3/02, C10K1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOMASSENGASIFIZIERUNGS- UND GASREINIGUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN SOWIE SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR METHANOLHERSTELLUNG | [2013/25] | English: | BIOMASS GASIFICATION GAS PURIFICATION SYSTEM AND METHOD, AND METHANOL PRODUCTION SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2013/25] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PURIFICATION DE GAZ OBTENU PAR GAZÉIFICATION DE LA BIOMASSE, ET SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE MÉTHANOL | [2013/25] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2012 | Translation filed | 10.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 17.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.08.2011 | AL | 03.01.2018 | AT | 03.01.2018 | CY | 03.01.2018 | CZ | 03.01.2018 | DK | 03.01.2018 | EE | 03.01.2018 | ES | 03.01.2018 | FI | 03.01.2018 | HR | 03.01.2018 | IT | 03.01.2018 | LT | 03.01.2018 | LV | 03.01.2018 | MC | 03.01.2018 | MK | 03.01.2018 | NL | 03.01.2018 | PL | 03.01.2018 | PT | 03.01.2018 | RO | 03.01.2018 | RS | 03.01.2018 | SI | 03.01.2018 | SK | 03.01.2018 | SM | 03.01.2018 | TR | 03.01.2018 | BG | 03.04.2018 | NO | 03.04.2018 | GR | 04.04.2018 | IS | 03.05.2018 | GB | 03.08.2018 | IE | 03.08.2018 | LU | 03.08.2018 | MT | 03.08.2018 | BE | 31.08.2018 | CH | 31.08.2018 | FR | 31.08.2018 | LI | 31.08.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 03.08.2011 | |
AL | 03.01.2018 | ||
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PT | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
TR | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
GB | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 03.08.2018 | ||
LU | 03.08.2018 | ||
MT | 03.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
TR | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
GB | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 03.08.2018 | ||
LU | 03.08.2018 | ||
MT | 03.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
GB | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 03.08.2018 | ||
LU | 03.08.2018 | ||
MT | 03.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
GB | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 03.08.2018 | ||
LU | 03.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
IE | 03.08.2018 | ||
LU | 03.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
IE | 03.08.2018 | ||
LU | 03.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
LU | 03.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
SM | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 03.01.2018 | |
AT | 03.01.2018 | ||
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RS | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 03.01.2018 | |
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9941329 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [Y] 1-8 * page 5, line 27 - page 6, line 9 *; | [AD]JP2001240878 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [AD] 1-8* the whole document *; | [Y] - HILLER H ET AL, "Gas Production, 5.4. Absorption Processes", INTERNET CITATION, (20061215), pages 1,90 - 118,162, URL: http://mrw.interscience.wiley.com/emrw/9783527306732/ueic/article/a12_169/current/pdf, (20100804), XP002595382 [Y] 1-8 * page 93, paragraph 5.4.2 - page 93 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/14356007.A12_169.PUB2 | [A] - HAMELINCK C N ET AL, "Future prospects for production of methanol and hydrogen from biomass", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, ELSEVIER SA, CH, (20020918), vol. 111, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0378-7753(02)00220-3, ISSN 0378-7753, pages 1 - 22, XP004380118 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-7753(02)00220-3 | International search | [Y]JP2007204558 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL); | [Y]JP2009536262 (PLASCO ENERGY IP HOLDINGS, S.L., BILBAO, SCHAFFHAUSEN BRANCH); | [A]JP2009279473 (TAKUMA KK); | [Y]JP2010111779 (TAKUMA KK, et al) | by applicant | JP2001240877 | JP2001240878 | JP2004346285 | JP2006016470 |