Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.10.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
16.08.2013 | Change - inventor | published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] |
03.08.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.08.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] |
24.08.2012 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] |
07.08.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.07.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.07.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.07.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant | |
12.03.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.02.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication |