Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012243240 | Global Dossier | 27.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011JP04345 | 29.07.2011 | JP2011006413 | 14.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2012095902 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2014 | A1 | JP5028544B | 19.09.2012 | B2 | Priority number | Date | JP2011554312 | 29.07.2011 | WO2011JP04345 | 29.07.2011 | JP2011006413 | 14.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5416254B | Global Dossier | 12.02.2014 | B2 | JP2012234820 | 29.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2012145227 | 28.06.2012 | JP2011006413 | 14.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102713415B | Global Dossier | 17.06.2015 | B | CN102713415 | 03.10.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011JP04345 | 29.07.2011 | JP2011006413 | 14.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2503218 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011JP04345 | 29.07.2011 | JP2011006413 | 14.01.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012095902 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2011006413 | 14.01.2011 |