EP2619554 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING FLAWS IN CONTINUOUSLY PRODUCED FLOAT GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grenzebach Maschinenbau GmbH Albanusstrasse 1 86663 Asbach-Bäumenheim / DE | [2013/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZORN, Wolfgang Bergerwaldstrasse 27 81825 München / DE | 02 /
KRUG, Peter Kreillerstrasse 22 81673 München / DE | 03 /
BALLER, Winfried Sportplatzweg 3a 85614 Kirchseeon / DE | 04 /
BADER, Florian Schollstrasse 28 82380 Peissenberg / DE | [2013/31] | Representative(s) | Kindermann, Peter Patentanwälte Kindermann Postfach 10 02 34 85593 Baldham / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Kindermann, Peter Kindermann Patentanwälte Postfach 10 02 34 85593 Baldham / DE | Application number, filing date | 11817464.8 | 21.09.2011 | WO2011DE01772 | Priority number, date | DE20101046433 | 24.09.2010 Original published format: DE102010046433 | [2013/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012041285 | Date: | 05.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2619554 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/89, G01N21/896 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
G01N21/896 (EP,US);
G01N21/89 (KR);
G01N21/8903 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/31] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM DETEKTIEREN VON FEHLSTELLEN IN KONTINUIERLICH ERZEUGTEM FLOAT - GLAS | [2013/31] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING FLAWS IN CONTINUOUSLY PRODUCED FLOAT GLASS | [2013/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉTECTER DES POINTS DÉFECTUEUX DANS DU VERRE FLOTTÉ PRODUIT DE FAÇON CONTINUE | [2013/31] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 17.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]DE19813072 (LASER SORTER GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-16 * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 10 * * column 3, lines 18-20,32-47; figures 2,4 *; | [A]US2002140990 (LIU RONG-JI [TW]) [A] 1,8* paragraphs [0002] , [0009] , [0010] *; | [Y]US2004057046 (ABBOTT MARK M [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * paragraphs [0022] , [0041] , [0043] , [0049] , [0085] , [86114] * | by applicant | DE19643017 | DE19813072 |