EP2625300 - COPPER ALLOY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 30.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KME Germany GmbH & Co. KG Klosterstrasse 29 49074 Osnabrück / DE | [2016/51] |
Former [2013/33] | For all designated states KME Germany GmbH & Co. KG Klosterstrasse 29 49074 Osnabrück / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELMENKAMP, Thomas Gretescher Weg 45 49084 Osnabrück / DE | 02 /
RODE, Dirk Lion-Feuchtwanger-Strasse 5 49088 Osnabrück / DE | 03 /
QUADFASEL, Uwe Wilhelm-Kelch-Strasse 46 49090 Osnabrück / DE | 04 /
SCHULZE, Hark Holzheider Weg 30 49205 Hasbergen / DE | [2013/33] | Representative(s) | Griepenstroh, Jörg Bockermann Ksoll Griepenstroh Osterhoff Patentanwälte Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | [2016/51] | Application number, filing date | 11817508.2 | 16.08.2011 | [2016/51] | WO2011DE01598 | Priority number, date | DE20101038060 | 08.10.2010 Original published format: DE102010038060 | [2013/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012062248 | Date: | 18.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2625300 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2625300 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C22C9/01, C22C9/05, C22C9/00 | [2016/34] | CPC: |
C22C9/05 (EP,US);
C22C9/00 (EP,US);
C22C9/01 (US)
|
Former IPC [2013/33] | C22C9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUPFERLEGIERUNG | [2013/33] | English: | COPPER ALLOY | [2013/33] | French: | ALLIAGE DE CUIVRE | [2013/33] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/33] | 17.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.08.2011 | AL | 21.12.2016 | CY | 21.12.2016 | DK | 21.12.2016 | EE | 21.12.2016 | ES | 21.12.2016 | HR | 21.12.2016 | LT | 21.12.2016 | LV | 21.12.2016 | MC | 21.12.2016 | MK | 21.12.2016 | MT | 21.12.2016 | NL | 21.12.2016 | RO | 21.12.2016 | RS | 21.12.2016 | SE | 21.12.2016 | SI | 21.12.2016 | SK | 21.12.2016 | SM | 21.12.2016 | NO | 21.03.2017 | GR | 22.03.2017 | IS | 21.04.2017 | PT | 21.04.2017 | GB | 16.08.2017 | IE | 16.08.2017 | CH | 31.08.2017 | LI | 31.08.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 16.08.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MK | 21.12.2016 | ||
MT | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
GB | 16.08.2017 | ||
IE | 16.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 16.08.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MT | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
GB | 16.08.2017 | ||
IE | 16.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 16.08.2011 | |
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MT | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
GB | 16.08.2017 | ||
IE | 16.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | DK | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MT | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
GB | 16.08.2017 | ||
IE | 16.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | DK | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
GB | 16.08.2017 | ||
IE | 16.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | DK | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | DK | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | DK | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | DK | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | EE | 21.12.2016 | |
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | HR | 21.12.2016 | |
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | HR | 21.12.2016 | |
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 21.12.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE1558707 (VER DEUTSCHE METALLWERKE AG) [X] 1,3,6-12 * example 14; table 1 *; | [A]JPS5760043 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * column 2 - column 3 *; | [X]US4337793 (SATO SHIRO, et al) [X] 4,5 * abstract *; | [I]DE3043833 (SUMITOMO LIGHT METAL IND [JP]) [I] 4 * example 14; table 1 *; | [A]US2006018784 (RECHTZIEGEL BRUNO [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0006] * | [A] - Elvira Moeller, Handbuch Konstruktionswerkstoffe, Hanser, (20081231), pages 365 - 370, ISBN 9783446401709, XP009158347 [A] 1-12 * page 369 - page 370; example CuSP; table 7.2 * | by applicant | US1959509 | US2027807 |