EP2605875 - ORGANIC ACID- OR LATENT ORGANIC ACID-FUNCTIONALIZED POLYMER-COATED METAL POWDERS FOR SOLDER PASTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel IP & Holding GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2014/51] |
Former [2014/33] | For all designated states Henkel US IP LLC One Henkel Way Rocky Hill, CT 06067 / US | ||
Former [2013/26] | For all designated states Henkel Corporation One Henkel Way Rocky Hill, CT 06067 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Puwei 815 Via Barquero San Marcos, CA 92069 / US | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | Henkel IP Department c/o Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2020/40] |
Former [2013/26] | Waloch, Christoph Andreas Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Patent VLI 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 11818714.5 | 17.08.2011 | [2020/40] | WO2011US48062 | Priority number, date | US20100860497 | 20.08.2010 Original published format: US 860497 | [2013/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012024382 | Date: | 23.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2605875 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2605875 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B22F1/02, B22F1/00, B23K35/26, B23K35/30, B23K35/36, B23K35/365 | [2017/15] | CPC: |
B23K35/3601 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/102 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/145 (EP,KR,US);
B23K35/262 (EP,KR,US);
B23K35/3006 (EP,KR,US);
B23K35/302 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/26] | B22F1/02, B23K35/363 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIT EINER ORGANISCHEN SÄURE ODER EINER LATENTEN ORGANISCHEN SÄURE FUNKTIONALISIERTE POLYMERBESCHICHTETE METALLPULVER FÜR LOTPASTEN | [2013/26] | English: | ORGANIC ACID- OR LATENT ORGANIC ACID-FUNCTIONALIZED POLYMER-COATED METAL POWDERS FOR SOLDER PASTES | [2013/26] | French: | POUDRES DE MÉTAL ENROBÉES DE POLYMÈRE À FONCTION ACIDE ORGANIQUE OU ACIDE ORGANIQUE LATENTE POUR PÂTES DE BRASAGE | [2013/26] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/26] | 04.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 30.09.2020 | AT | 30.09.2020 | CY | 30.09.2020 | DK | 30.09.2020 | ES | 30.09.2020 | FI | 30.09.2020 | IT | 30.09.2020 | LT | 30.09.2020 | LV | 30.09.2020 | MC | 30.09.2020 | MK | 30.09.2020 | MT | 30.09.2020 | RO | 30.09.2020 | RS | 30.09.2020 | SE | 30.09.2020 | SI | 30.09.2020 | SK | 30.09.2020 | SM | 30.09.2020 | TR | 30.09.2020 | BG | 30.12.2020 | NO | 30.12.2020 | GR | 31.12.2020 | IS | 30.01.2021 | PT | 01.02.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CY | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
MK | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
TR | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CY | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
MK | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CY | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
NO | 30.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4298407 (TAYLOR BARRY E) [A] 1-14 * column 3, line 19 - line 26 * * claims 1-22 *; | [A]WO9520460 (INDIUM CORP AMERICA [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract ** claims 1-37 *; | [A]US5885369 (HANAWA KENZO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * column 2, line 49 - column 5, line 8 * * column 7, line 47 - line 53 *; | [X]JP2009030111 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) [X] 1,2,4,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0 32] * * claims 1-6 *; | [XD]WO2010059924 (HENKEL CORP [US], et al) [XD] 1,3-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0 37] - [0039] * * claims 1-16 *; | [A] - R. A. SPERLING ET AL, "Surface modification, functionalization and bioconjugation of colloidal inorganic nanoparticles", PHILOSOPHICAL TRANSACTIONS OF THE ROYAL SOCIETY A: MATHEMATICAL, PHYSICAL AND ENGINEERING SCIENCES, (20100328), vol. 368, no. 1915, doi:10.1098/rsta.2009.0273, ISSN 1364-503X, pages 1333 - 1383, XP055045855 [A] 1-14 * pages 1343-1344, d) Polymer coatings * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1098/rsta.2009.0273 | International search | [A]US5062896 (HUANG WU-SONG [US], et al); | [A]US5830389 (CAPOTE MIGUEL ALBERT [US], et al); | [A]US5851311 (DIAMANT JORAM [US], et al); | [A]JP2000141084 (SOPHIA SYSTEMS & TECHNOLOGY) | by applicant | US4298407 | US4452861 | US4994326 | US5328522 | WO9520460 | US5885369 | US6416863 | US2005171273 | WO2010059924 | - Philosophical Transactions of the Royal Society: Mathematical, Physical and Engineering Science, (20100000), vol. 368, no. 1915 |