EP2626618 - SIMULATED SUNLIGHT LIGHT IRRADIATION DEVICE AND INSPECTION DEVICE FOR SOLAR CELL PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/33] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Atsushi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2013/33] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/33] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Straße 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11819148.5 | 29.08.2011 | WO2011JP04806 | Priority number, date | JP20100229123 | 08.10.2010 Original published format: JP 2010229123 | [2013/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012046378 | Date: | 12.04.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2626618 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F21S2/00, F21V9/08 | [2013/33] | CPC: |
F21S8/006 (EP,US);
H02S50/10 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/33] | Title | German: | LICHTBESTRAHLUNGSVORRICHTUNG, PSEUDOSONNENLICHTBESTRAHLUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND SOLARTAFEL-PRÜFVORRICHTUNG | [2013/33] | English: | SIMULATED SUNLIGHT LIGHT IRRADIATION DEVICE AND INSPECTION DEVICE FOR SOLAR CELL PANEL | [2013/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RAYONNEMENT LUMINEUX IMITANT LA LUMIÈRE DU SOLEIL ET DISPOSITIF D'INSPECTION POUR PANNEAU DE CELLULE SOLAIRE | [2013/33] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2012 | Translation filed | 23.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 23.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2012 | Examination requested [2013/33] | 01.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/15] | 17.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US4933813 (BERGER DANIEL S [US]) [I] 1-10 * column 3, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3; figures 1, 2 *; | [XI]US5217285 (SOPORI BHUSHAN L [US]) [X] 1-3,6,7,10 * abstract * * column 6, paragraph l * * column 10, paragraph 2; figure 5 * [I] 4,5,8,9; | [I]EP2146137 (BOEING CO [US]) [I] 1-10* abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH05342904 (PHOTONICS KK, et al); | [Y]JP2008216840 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]WO2010004610 (KIRYU CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2010027826 (NISSHINBO HOLDINGS INC); | [Y]WO2010050489 (ZEON CORP [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2009145254 |