EP2610377 - BASE FABRIC FOR AIRBAG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Revocation of patent | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | 15.07.2022 | New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 1-105 Kanda Jinbocho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8101 / JP | [2017/24] |
Former [2013/27] | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Fibers Corporation 3-23, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 5308205 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Takeshi 1-105, Kanda Jinbocho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1018101 / JP | 02 /
ISE, Fumiaki 1-105, Kanda Jinbocho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1018101 / JP | 03 /
OKUNO, Tokio 1-105, Kanda Jinbocho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1018101 / JP | 04 /
ENOKI, Masato 1-105, Kanda Jinbocho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1018101 / JP | [2013/27] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/06] | von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2013/27] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 11819918.1 | 23.08.2011 | [2016/06] | WO2011JP68946 | Priority number, date | JP20100186323 | 23.08.2010 Original published format: JP 2010186323 | [2013/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012026455 | Date: | 01.03.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2610377 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2610377 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2610377 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | D03D15/00, B60R21/235, D03D1/02, D06M15/643, D06N3/00 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
D03D1/02 (EP,KR,US);
B60R21/235 (EP,KR,US);
D03D15/283 (KR);
D03D15/41 (KR);
D06N3/0006 (US);
B60R2021/23509 (EP,US);
D10B2331/02 (KR);
D10B2505/124 (KR);
Y10T442/2008 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/27] | D03D15/00, B60R21/235, D03D1/02, D06M15/643 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GRUNDGEWEBE FÜR AIRBAGS | [2013/27] | English: | BASE FABRIC FOR AIRBAG | [2013/27] | French: | TISSU DE BASE POUR COUSSIN DE SÉCURITÉ GONFLABLE | [2013/27] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2013 | Translation filed | 19.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 19.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/27] | 25.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.11.2016
16.11.2016
ADMISSIBLE Toyobo Co., Ltd. 2-8, Dojima Hama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8230 / JP Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/51] | 15.12.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.04.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.02.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.02.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.03.2022 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/33] | 03.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 25.04.2019 | Appeal received No. T1185/19 | 04.07.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.03.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 03.06.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 18.04.2019 | Appeal received No. T1185/19 | 02.07.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.03.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 03.06.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 15.03.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.08.2011 | AL | 10.02.2016 | AT | 10.02.2016 | BE | 10.02.2016 | CY | 10.02.2016 | CZ | 10.02.2016 | DK | 10.02.2016 | EE | 10.02.2016 | ES | 10.02.2016 | FI | 10.02.2016 | HR | 10.02.2016 | IT | 10.02.2016 | LT | 10.02.2016 | LV | 10.02.2016 | MC | 10.02.2016 | MK | 10.02.2016 | NL | 10.02.2016 | PL | 10.02.2016 | RO | 10.02.2016 | RS | 10.02.2016 | SE | 10.02.2016 | SI | 10.02.2016 | SK | 10.02.2016 | SM | 10.02.2016 | TR | 10.02.2016 | BG | 10.05.2016 | NO | 10.05.2016 | GR | 11.05.2016 | IS | 10.06.2016 | PT | 13.06.2016 | GB | 23.08.2016 | IE | 23.08.2016 | LU | 23.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | FR | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 23.08.2011 | |
AT | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CY | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
MK | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
TR | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
GB | 23.08.2016 | ||
IE | 23.08.2016 | ||
LU | 23.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 23.08.2011 | |
AT | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CY | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
MK | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
TR | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
GB | 23.08.2016 | ||
IE | 23.08.2016 | ||
LU | 23.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 23.08.2011 | |
AT | 10.02.2016 | ||
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CY | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
MK | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
GB | 23.08.2016 | ||
IE | 23.08.2016 | ||
LU | 23.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
GB | 23.08.2016 | ||
IE | 23.08.2016 | ||
LU | 23.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
MC | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SI | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
BG | 10.05.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
BE | 10.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
CZ | 10.02.2016 | ||
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RO | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
SK | 10.02.2016 | ||
SM | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
EE | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
DK | 10.02.2016 | ||
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LV | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
RS | 10.02.2016 | ||
SE | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 10.06.2016 | ||
PT | 13.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 10.02.2016 | |
ES | 10.02.2016 | ||
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
IT | 10.02.2016 | ||
LT | 10.02.2016 | ||
NL | 10.02.2016 | ||
PL | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 10.02.2016 | |
FI | 10.02.2016 | ||
HR | 10.02.2016 | ||
NO | 10.05.2016 | ||
GR | 11.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | JPH0742043K [ ] (SEIREN CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0742043 (SEIREN CO LTD) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0015] *; | [YD]JP2003171842 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [YD] 1-14 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0030] *; | [Y]EP1433672 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0058] * | International search | [Y]JPH0742043 (SEIREN CO LTD); | [A]JPH10168700 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JPH11293541 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JP2001233153 (TOYODA SPINNING & WEAVING, et al); | [Y]JP2003171842 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]JP2004137622 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [Y]JP2004217203 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [A]JP2004308076 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JP2006256474 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JP2010047872 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) | by applicant | JP2002327352 | JP2003171842 | JP2009167551 | JP2009256860 | Opposition | US5508073 | JP2000110049 | JP2002266195 | JP2003171842 | JP2006183205 | JP2006256474 | JP2012052280 | - Experimental report: shrinkage force of yarns with different boiling water shrinkage depending on the treatment temperature | - Scheme of the production and distribution chain of prior use Product A and Product B | - Documentation concerning production and delivery of Product A-(A) including D3-1 to D3-6 and English translation | - Documentation concerning production and delivery of Product A-(B) including D4-1 to D4-6 and English translation | - "Cargo Receipt/Delivery Specification", Chuo Warehouse and English translation | - Test data of airbag base fabrics (prior use Product A) including D6-1 to D6-4 and English translation | - Photographs of fabric samples of Product A-(A) and A-(B | - Declaration of Mr. Hiratani | - Detailed comparison of the public prior use Product A with the claims of the opposed patent | - Analysis of base fabric for airbags of Product A (nylon 66 fiber) and English translation | - SEM photographs of Products A-(A) and A-(B) showing the absence of resin coating on base fabric and English translation | - Test data and photographs of airbag module (prior use Product B) including D12-1 to D12-16 and English translation | - Detailed comparison of the public prior use Product B with the claims of the opposed patent | - Photos of the handle cover of Product B | - Statement of Mr. Masataka Adachi concerning the manufacturing date of an airbag and an airbag module (Product B) including D15-1 and D15-2 and English translation | - Statement of Mr. Takeo Kashima concerning sales and specification of airbag base fabric and its use in Mitsubishi Grandis cars and English translation | - Ledger sheet from a computer system of Mitsubishi Motors showing reference status of parts for use in automobile manufacturing in Mitsubishi Motors and English translation | - Statement of Mr. Takeo Kashima concerning the absence of confidentiality obligations in airbag base fabric sales contracts and common practice of reverse engineering | - URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/Mki/Mtsubishi_Grandis | - "Thread Drawing-out Method", Excerpt from JIS L1096- 1990, 6.21 .2 Method A | - Statement of Mr. Yoshihiro Matsui regarding the relationship between the pullout resistance of the opposed patent and the pullout strength/drawing out strength of prior art and English translation | - Certificate of Experimental Results regarding the correlation between Hot-Water Shrinkage and Dry-Heat Shrinkage | - Table 2 of D27 (translation | - Table providing comparison of data in Table 2 of D27 and in opposed patent | - BAG et al., 98, Proceedings of the 5th Int. Akzo Nobel Symposium on Automotive Occupant Restraint Systems, (19980000), page 219 | - Partial copy from ''First Course in Fiber'' and English translation |