EP2608723 - HELICAL FASTENERS AND METHODS FOR DEPLOYING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2016 [2016/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pavilion Medical Innovations 50 Loring Drive Norwell, Massachusetts 02061 / US | [2013/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIN, Albert K. 1638 Portola Avenue Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | [2013/27] | Representative(s) | Atkinson, Jonathan David Mark, et al HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Atkinson, Jonathan David Mark, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | ||
Former [2013/27] | Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 11820761.2 | 26.08.2011 | WO2011US49459 | Priority number, date | US20100377203P | 26.08.2010 Original published format: US 377203 P | [2013/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012027724 | Date: | 01.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2608723 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/08 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
A61B17/0644 (EP,US);
A61B17/0469 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06052 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06076 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06171 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0649 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/27] | Title | German: | SPIRALFÖRMIGE BEFESTIGER UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER BEREITSTELLUNG | [2013/27] | English: | HELICAL FASTENERS AND METHODS FOR DEPLOYING SAME | [2013/27] | French: | ÉLÉMENTS DE FIXATION HÉLICOÏDAUX ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE DÉPLOIEMENT | [2013/27] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/27] | 20.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/42] | 02.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004147957 (PIERSON RAYMOND H [US]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0086] * * figures 1A-C,1H *; | [X]EP1836971 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0094] * * figures 2,23 *; | [E]WO2012007042 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US], et al) [E] 1-8 * page 5, line 34 - page 7, line 14 ** figures 5-8 * | International search | [A]US5662683 (KAY DAVID B [US]); | [L]US5782844 (YOON INBAE [US], et al); | [X]US5810851 (YOON INBAE [US]); | [A]US6837893 (MILLER ARNOLD [US]); | [A]US6884248 (BOLDUC LEE [US], et al) |