Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2012029803 | Global Dossier | 31.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2010193039 | 31.08.2010 | WO2011JP69640 | 30.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103098270 | Global Dossier | 08.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2010193039 | 31.08.2010 | WO2011JP69640 | 30.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2613385 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2010193039 | 31.08.2010 | WO2011JP69640 | 30.08.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012029803 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2010193039 | 31.08.2010 |