EP2612892 - FRICTION MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | For all designated states Akebono Brake Industry Co., Ltd. 19-5, Nihonbashi Koami-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8534 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | ||
For all designated states Akebono Brake Industry Co., Ltd. 19-5, Nihonbashi Koami-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8534 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATANO, Naoki c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
OGATA, Yoshio c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
FUKUI, Takayuki c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
MOCHIDA, Masahiro c/o Akebono Brake Industry Co., Ltd. 19-5, Nihonbashi Koami-cho Cho-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
TAKAHASHI, Yasunori c/o Akebono Brake Industry Co., Ltd. 19-5, Nihonbashi Koami-cho Cho-ku Tokyo / JP | [2013/28] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11821938.5 | 01.09.2011 | WO2011JP69942 | Priority number, date | JP20100197843 | 03.09.2010 Original published format: JP 2010197843 | [2013/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012029923 | Date: | 08.03.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2612892 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16D69/02 | [2014/31] | CPC: |
F16D69/026 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (US);
C08K3/32 (US);
F16D2200/0065 (EP,US);
F16D2200/0086 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/28] | C09K3/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/28] | Title | German: | REIBUNGSMATERIAL | [2013/28] | English: | FRICTION MATERIAL | [2013/28] | French: | MATÉRIAU DE FROTTEMENT | [2013/28] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2013 | Translation filed | 01.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 27.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0540323 (AKEBONO RES & DEV CENTRE [JP], et al) [I] 1-5 * claims 1,3,5,8 *; | [A]EP0554902 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010084233 (SUBRAMANIAN VIJAY [US]) [A] 1-5* the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2009102584 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2009132816 (ADVICS CO LTD); | [A]JP2010077341 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD) | by applicant | JP2004346179 | JP2007314598 | JP2009132816 | JP20100197843 |