EP2612222 - USE CAMERA TO AUGMENT INPUT FOR PORTABLE ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2013/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMAN, Tiruvilwamalai, Venkatraman 6217 Hopi Court San Jose CA 95123 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Charles, L. 4170 Blackford Circle San Jose, CA 95117 / US | 03 /
GHARPURE, Chaitanya 777 W. Middlefield Road Apartment 196 Mountain View CA 94043 / US | 04 /
GANOV, Svetoslav 550 Moreland Way 2318 Santa Clara CA 95054 / US | [2013/28] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | Ahmad, Sheikh Shakeel, et al Keltie LLP Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London EC4M 7ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 11822469.0 | 30.08.2011 | WO2011US49678 | Priority number, date | US20100872091 | 31.08.2010 Original published format: US 872091 | [2013/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012030789 | Date: | 08.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2612222 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/03, G06F3/041, G06T9/20 | [2013/28] | CPC: |
G06F3/017 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/03 (KR);
G06F3/0304 (KR);
G06F3/0346 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/28] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINER KAMERA ZUR VERMEHRUNG DER EINGABEN IN EINE TRAGBARE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2013/28] | English: | USE CAMERA TO AUGMENT INPUT FOR PORTABLE ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2013/28] | French: | UTILISATION D'UNE CAMÉRA POUR AUGMENTER LES ÉLÉMENTS D'ENTRÉE POUR UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE PORTABLE | [2013/28] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 21.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/32] | 04.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006026521 (HOTELLING STEVE [US], et al); | [Y]WO2007089766 (APPLE COMPUTER [US], et al); | [A]US2008048972 (KAKARALA RAMAKRISHNA [US]); | [Y]US2008168403 (WESTERMAN WAYNE CARL [US], et al) |