EP2625377 - METHODS FOR COMPLETING MULTI-ZONE PRODUCTION WELLS USING SLIDING SLEEVE VALVE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | For:GB
NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola 1110 / VG | For:AL
AT
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
HR
HU
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SK
SM
TR
PRAD Research and Development Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola 1110 / VG | For:IS
Schlumberger Technology Corporation 300 Schlumberger Drive Sugar Land, TX 77478 / US | For all designated states Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89 2514 JG The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/33] | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | ||
For:GB
NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town Tortola 1110 / VG | |||
For:AL
AT
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
HR
HU
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SK
SM
TR
PRAD Research and Development Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola 1110 / VG | |||
For:IS
Schlumberger Technology Corporation 300 Schlumberger Drive Sugar Land, TX 77478 / US | |||
For all designated states Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89 2514 JG The Hague / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GANGULY, Partha 7419 Baldwin Crossing Sugar Land TX 77479 / US | 02 /
HUH, Michael 814 Riverside Dr. Alvin TX 77511 / US | 03 /
DANOS, Jake 303 Big Hollow Lane Houston TX 77042 / US | 04 /
STAMM, Bryan 621 Roy Street Houston TX 77007 / US | [2013/33] | Representative(s) | Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department High Cross Madingley Road Cambridge CB3 0EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/33] | Fortt, Simon Merton, et al Schlumberger Cambridge Research Ltd IPL High Cross, Madingley Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB3 0EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 11822501.0 | 30.08.2011 | WO2011US49764 | Priority number, date | US20100378736P | 31.08.2010 Original published format: US 378736 P | [2013/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012030843 | Date: | 08.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2625377 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E21B34/06, E21B43/26 | [2013/33] | CPC: |
E21B43/26 (EP,US);
E21B43/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SCHLIESSEN VON MEHRBEREICHSBOHRLÖCHERN MITHILFE EINER SCHIEBEHÜLSENANORDNUNG | [2013/33] | English: | METHODS FOR COMPLETING MULTI-ZONE PRODUCTION WELLS USING SLIDING SLEEVE VALVE ASSEMBLY | [2013/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE CONDITIONNER DES PUITS DE PRODUCTION À PLUSIEURS ZONES EN UTILISANT UN ENSEMBLE SOUPAPE À MANCHON COULISSANT | [2013/33] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/33] | 08.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/32] | 03.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5865251 (REBARDI WADE [US], et al) [Y] 2,6-10,12-14 * column 4, lines 42-51 *; | [Y]US2006207763 (HOFMAN RAYMOND A [US]) [Y] 3,6-10 * paragraphs [0042] , [0043] *; | [A]US2009044944 (MURRAY DOUGLAS J [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XAY]US2009084553 (RYTLEWSKI GARY L [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0031] * [A] 5,11,15 [Y] 2-4,6-10,12-14; | [YA]US2010044041 (SMITH MALCOLM [US], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0090] * [A] 5 | International search | [A]US6186236 (COX MORRIS W [US]); | [A]US7575062 (EAST JR LOYD [US]); | [A]US2009260835 (MALONE BRADLEY P [US]); | [A]US2010012318 (LUCE THOMAS A [US], et al) |