Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] |
24.03.2015 | Change - representative | |
11.12.2014 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.11.2014 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
07.03.2014 | Supplementary search report | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] |
07.03.2014 | Change - classification | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] |
07.03.2014 | Change - classification | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] |
15.11.2013 | Change - extension states | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
09.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant | |
16.09.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.06.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] |
14.06.2013 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] |
15.05.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.04.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant | |
04.05.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.03.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.03.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication |