Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014004186 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011IB02737 | 08.09.2011 | US38106510 | 08.09.2010 | US201113825789 | 08.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20130139896 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011IB02737 | 08.09.2011 | US38106510 | 08.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013537185 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011IB02737 | 08.09.2011 | US38106510 | 08.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2613766 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2014 | A4 | EP2613766 | 17.07.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2011IB02737 | 08.09.2011 | US38106510 | 08.09.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012032415 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2012 | A3 | WO2012032415 | 15.03.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US38106510 | 08.09.2010 |