EP2615457 - REAGENT COMPOSITION FOR NUCLEIC ACID CHROMATOGRAPHY OR IMMUNOCHROMATOGRAPHY, METHOD FOR MEASUREMENT BY NUCLEIC ACID CHROMATOGRAPHY OR IMMUNOCHROMATOGRAPHY, AND KIT FOR MEASUREMENT BY NUCLEIC ACID CHROMATOGRAPHY OR IMMUNOCHROMATOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tanaka Kikinzoku Kogyo K.K. 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6422 / JP | [2013/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKAKIBARA, Yuhiro c/o Hiratsuka Technical Center Tanaka Kikinzoku Kogyo K.K. 2-73, Shin-machi, Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-0076 / JP | [2013/29] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/02] |
Former [2013/29] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11823273.5 | 14.01.2011 | [2016/02] | WO2011JP50564 | Priority number, date | JP20100200793 | 08.09.2010 Original published format: JP 2010200793 | [2013/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012032794 | Date: | 15.03.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2615457 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2615457 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, G01N33/558, C12Q1/68 | [2014/10] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6804 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/54387 (KR);
G01N30/00 (KR,US);
C07K16/1018 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/54388 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/54393 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6804, C12Q2527/137 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/29] | G01N33/543 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REAGENZIENZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR NUKLEINSÄURE-CHROMATOGRAPHIE ODER IMMUNCHROMATOGRAPHIE, VERFAHREN FÜR MESSUNGEN DURCH NUKLEINSÄURE-CHROMATOGRAPHIE ODER IMMUNCHROMATOGRAPHIE UND KIT FÜR MESSUNGEN DURCH NUKLEINSÄURE-CHROMATOGRAPHIE ODER IMMUNCHROMATOGRAPHIE | [2013/29] | English: | REAGENT COMPOSITION FOR NUCLEIC ACID CHROMATOGRAPHY OR IMMUNOCHROMATOGRAPHY, METHOD FOR MEASUREMENT BY NUCLEIC ACID CHROMATOGRAPHY OR IMMUNOCHROMATOGRAPHY, AND KIT FOR MEASUREMENT BY NUCLEIC ACID CHROMATOGRAPHY OR IMMUNOCHROMATOGRAPHY | [2013/29] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉACTIF POUR LA CHROMATOGRAPHIE OU L'IMMUNOCHROMATOGRAPHIE D'ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE PAR LA CHROMATOGRAPHIE OU L'IMMUNOCHROMATOGRAPHIE D'ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE, ET KIT DE MESURE PAR CHROMATOGRAPHIE OU IMMUNOCHROMATOGRAPHIE D'ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE | [2013/29] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2013 | Translation filed | 25.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/29] | 13.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.01.2011 | AL | 13.01.2016 | AT | 13.01.2016 | BE | 13.01.2016 | CY | 13.01.2016 | CZ | 13.01.2016 | DK | 13.01.2016 | EE | 13.01.2016 | ES | 13.01.2016 | FI | 13.01.2016 | HR | 13.01.2016 | IT | 13.01.2016 | LT | 13.01.2016 | LV | 13.01.2016 | MC | 13.01.2016 | MK | 13.01.2016 | NL | 13.01.2016 | PL | 13.01.2016 | RO | 13.01.2016 | RS | 13.01.2016 | SE | 13.01.2016 | SI | 13.01.2016 | SK | 13.01.2016 | SM | 13.01.2016 | TR | 13.01.2016 | IE | 14.01.2016 | LU | 14.01.2016 | CH | 31.01.2016 | LI | 31.01.2016 | MT | 31.01.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | NO | 13.04.2016 | GR | 14.04.2016 | IS | 13.05.2016 | PT | 13.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 14.01.2011 | |
AT | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MK | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
TR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IE | 14.01.2016 | ||
LU | 14.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
MT | 31.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 14.01.2011 | |
AT | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MK | 13.01.2016 | ||
MT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
TR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IE | 14.01.2016 | ||
LU | 14.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 14.01.2011 | |
AT | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MK | 13.01.2016 | ||
MT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
IE | 14.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
IE | 14.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
IE | 14.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
IE | 14.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 13.01.2016 | |
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | BE | 31.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US4931385 (BLOCK ELLIOTT [US], et al); | [Y]WO02085185 (ADHESIVES RES INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2008108147 (WEI TIE [US], et al); | [XY]EP2108961 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) | International search | [A]JPH10332699 (IATRON LAB); | [A]JP2002122598 (NITTO DENKO CORP); | [A]WO03085402 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2007248073 (FUJIREBIO KK); | [A]JP2008164334 (HOGI MEDICAL KK); | [A]JP2009250763 (MITSUBISHI CHEM MEDIENCE CORP); | [A]WO2010007734 (TANAKA PRECIOUS METAL IND [JP], et al) |