EP2613934 - SIZE SELECTIVE POLYMER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cytosorbents, Inc. 7 Deer Park Dr. Suite K Monmouth Junction, NJ 08852 / US | [2013/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOUNG, Wei-Tai 5 Deer Haven Drive Hillsborough, NJ 08844 / US | 02 /
ALBRIGHT, Robert 36 Autumn Road Southampton, PA 18966-1011 / US | 03 /
GOLOBISH, Thomas 16 Evergreen Circle Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 04 /
COPPONI, Vincent 204 Heskers Ct. Monmouth Junction, NJ 08852 / US | 05 /
CHAN, Philip 1004 Owi Lane Cherry Hill, NJ 08003 / US | [2013/29] | Representative(s) | DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Brienner Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11823877.3 | 07.09.2011 | WO2011US01549 | Priority number, date | US20100807597 | 09.09.2010 Original published format: US 807597 | [2013/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012033522 | Date: | 15.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2613934 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/26, B01J20/28, B32B3/26, C08J9/00, B82Y30/00 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
B01J20/26 (EP,BR,US);
C08J9/00 (BR);
A61P7/08 (EP,BR);
B01J20/261 (EP,US);
B01J20/262 (EP,US);
B01J20/28083 (EP,US);
B01J20/28085 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (BR);
A61M1/3679 (EP,US);
B01D15/34 (EP,US);
B32B3/26 (BR);
Y10T428/249987 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249991 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/29] | B32B3/26, C08J9/00, B82Y30/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/29] | Title | German: | GRÖSSENSELEKTIVES POLYMERSYSTEM | [2013/29] | English: | SIZE SELECTIVE POLYMER SYSTEM | [2013/29] | French: | SYSTÈME POLYMÈRE SÉLECTIF EN FONCTION DE LA TAILLE | [2013/29] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2013 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/29] | 06.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.11.2019 | 18.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/02] | 07.01.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.11.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/02] | Appeal following examination | 28.02.2020 | Appeal received No. T1320/20 | 08.05.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.11.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 07.12.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 10.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2016 | 30.09.2019 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2020 | 30.09.2020 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   28.12.2020 | 30.09.2021 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   23.03.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008063666 (MEDASORB TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 13 - page 21; figure 1; examples 1-4; claim 1 * * claims 2, 3, 5, 7, 8, 11-16 *; | [X] - DAVANKOV V ET AL, "Polymeric adsorbent for removing toxic proteins from blood of patients with kidney failure", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B: BIOMEDICAL SCIENCES AND APPLICATIONS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NL, (20000201), vol. 739, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0378-4347(99)00554-X, ISSN 0378-4347, pages 73 - 80, XP004190288 [X] 1-11 * abstract * * Section: "3. Properties of current adsorbing materials for beta2-microgloubin"; page 75 - page 77; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-4347(99)00554-X | [X] - ALBRIGHT ET AL, "Porous polymers as an anchor for catalysis", REACTIVE POLYMERS, ION EXCHANGERS, SORBENTS, ELSEVIER, vol. 4, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0167-6989(86)90010-3, ISSN 0167-6989, (19860401), pages 155 - 174, (19860401), XP024146626 [X] 1-11 * page 166; table 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-6989(86)90010-3 | [X] - BADYAL J P ET AL, "Comparison of the effect of pore architecture and bead size on the extent of plasmachemical amine functionalisation of poly(styrene-co-divinylbenzene) permanently porous resins", POLYMER, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, GB, (20040301), vol. 45, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.POLYMER.2004.01.072, ISSN 0032-3861, pages 2185 - 2192, XP004493335 [X] 1-14 * abstract * * Section: "2.3. Suspension polymerization"; page 2186, column right - page 2187, column left * * experiments 1-8; page 2188; table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.polymer.2004.01.072 | International search | [Y]US4202775 (ABE TSUTOMU [JP], et al); | [Y]US5416124 (STRINGFIELD RICHARD T [US]); | [Y]US5773384 (DAVANKOV VADIM A [RU], et al); | [Y]US6325939 (STROM ROBERT M [US], et al) | by applicant | US5904663 | US6338801 | US6527735 | US6600014 | WO2008063666 | - KAZAMA, Nephrol. Dial. Transplant, (20010000), vol. 16, pages 31 - 35 | - Davankov et al., "Polymeric adsorbent for removing toxic proteins from blood of patients with kidney failure", Journal of Chromatography B: Biomedical sciences and applications,, (20000201), vol. 739, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/S0378-4347(99)00554-X, pages 73 - 80, XP004190288 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-4347(99)00554-X | - Albright et al., "Porous polymers as an anchor for catalysis", Reactive polymers, ion exchangers, sorbents, (19860401), vol. 4, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/0167-6989(86)90010-3, pages 155 - 174, XP024146626 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-6989(86)90010-3 | - Badyal J. P. et al., "Comparison of the effect of pore architecture and bead size on the extent of plasmachemical amine functionalisation of poly(styrene-co-divinylbenzene) permanently porous resins", Polymer,, (20040301), vol. 45, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1016/j.polymer.2004.01.072, pages 2185 - 2192, XP004493335 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.polymer.2004.01.072 |