EP2614170 - IMPROVED 7XXX ALUMINUM ALLOYS, AND METHODS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arconic Inc. 201 Isabella Street Pittsburgh, PA 15212 / US | [2017/15] |
Former [2013/29] | For all designated states Alcoa Inc. Alcoa Corporate Center 201 Isabella Street Pittsburgh, PA 15212-5858 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMAT, Rajeev, G. 5124 Cypress Drive Murrysville Pennsylvania 15668 / US | 02 /
NEWMAN, John M. 5937 Graybrooke Drive Export Pennsylvania 15632 / US | 03 /
SAWTELL, Ralph, R. 466 Four Lakes Drive Gibsonia Pennsylvania 15044 / US | 04 /
LIN, Jen C. 1001 Alton Court Export Pennsylvania 15632 / US | [2013/29] | Representative(s) | Lenzing Gerber Stute PartG von Patentanwälten m.b.B. Bahnstraße 9 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Lenzing Gerber Stute Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten Bahnstraße 9 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 11824141.3 | 08.09.2011 | WO2011US50868 | Priority number, date | US201161437515P | 28.01.2011 Original published format: US 201161437515 P | US201061425024P | 20.12.2010 Original published format: US 201061425024 P | US20100391461P | 08.10.2010 Original published format: US 391461 P | US20100381040P | 08.09.2010 Original published format: US 381040 P | [2013/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012033939 | Date: | 15.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2614170 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C22C21/00, B22D21/04, C22F1/04 | [2015/42] | CPC: |
C22C21/08 (EP,US);
C22C21/10 (EP,RU,US);
C22F1/04 (KR);
C22C21/00 (KR);
C22C21/02 (EP,US);
C22C21/14 (EP,US);
C22C21/16 (EP,US);
C22F1/053 (EP,RU,US);
C22F1/057 (EP,US);
F16L9/02 (EP,US);
C22F1/05 (RU);
F24S23/82 (EP,US);
Y02B10/20 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/29] | C22C21/10, B22D21/04, C22F1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/29] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE 7XXX-ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2013/29] | English: | IMPROVED 7XXX ALUMINUM ALLOYS, AND METHODS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2013/29] | French: | ALLIAGES D'ALUMINIUM 7XXX PERFECTIONNÉS ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION | [2013/29] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2013 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/29] | 11.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.02.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/01] | 12.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.05.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.03.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 19.03.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.04.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4618382 (MIYAGI YOSHIMITSU [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 62; examples 1,3,5; tables 1,5 *; | [X]US4410370 (BABA YOSHIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 1, line 13 - line 32 * * examples 1-4; tables 1-4 *; | [X]JPH08325664 (SKY ALUMINIUM) [X] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH08325664 (SKY ALUMINIUM); | [X]JPH10168536 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JPH09256129 (SKY ALUMINIUM); | [A]US4618382 (MIYAGI YOSHIMITSU [JP], et al) | by applicant | US7182825 | US6672368 | US2003079856 | US2005011630 | US2008182122 | WO2007098583 | - TexSEM Lab OIM Data Collection Software, EDAX Inc. | - JEOL JSM6510, JEOL Ltd. | - KURODA, M. et al., "Texture optimization of rolled aluminum alloy sheets using a genetic algorithm", Materials Science and Engineering A, (20040000), vol. 385, doi:doi:10.1016/j.msea.2004.06.029, pages 235 - 244, XP004592075 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.msea.2004.06.029 | - MAN; CHI-SING, "On the r-value of textured sheet metals", International Journal of Plasticity, (20020000), vol. 18, pages 1683 - 1706 |