EP2615971 - METHODS FOR ASSESSING SWALLOWING MOTOR FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK, SM | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Women's and Children's Health Network Incorporated 72 King William Road North Adelaide, SA 5006 / AU | [2013/41] |
Former [2013/30] | For all designated states Women's and Children's Health Research Institute Inc. 72 King William Road North Adelaide, SA 5006 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OMARI, Taher, Imad 127 Sussex Street North Adelaide South Australia 5006 / AU | 02 /
ROMMEL, Nathalie Department of Neurosciences ExpORL University of Leuven Herestraat 49 (O&N2, PO 721) 3000Leuven / BE | [2013/30] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/43] |
Former [2013/30] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11824347.6 | 13.09.2011 | [2023/43] | WO2011AU01174 | Priority number, date | AU20110902359 | 16.06.2011 Original published format: AU 2011902359 | AU20100904104 | 13.09.2010 Original published format: AU 2010904104 | [2013/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012034168 | Date: | 22.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2615971 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2615971 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 22.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/053, A61B5/00, A61B5/03, A61B5/0538 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
A61B5/4205 (EP,GB,US);
A61B5/037 (EP,GB,US);
A61B5/036 (EP,US);
A61B5/038 (GB);
A61B5/053 (GB);
A61B5/0538 (EP,US);
A61B5/7235 (EP,US);
A61B5/7275 (EP,US);
A61B5/7282 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
G16H50/30 (EP,US);
G16H20/40 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/11] | A61B5/053, A61B5/03, A61B5/042, A61B5/00 | ||
Former IPC [2013/30] | A61B5/053, A61B5/03, A61B5/042 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSUCHUNG DER SCHLUCKBEWEGUNGSFUNKTION | [2013/30] | English: | METHODS FOR ASSESSING SWALLOWING MOTOR FUNCTION | [2013/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'ÉVALUATION DE LA FONCTION MOTRICE DE DÉGLUTITION | [2013/30] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/30] | 02.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.04.2023 | 20.04.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.10.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 03.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 19.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.10.2023 | DK | 25.10.2023 | ES | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | LT | 25.10.2023 | LV | 25.10.2023 | NL | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SE | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | BG | 25.01.2024 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | PT | 26.02.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 25.10.2023 | |
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 25.10.2023 | |
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 25.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2004254495 (MABARY JERRY E [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2005065450 (STUEBE THOMAS D [US], et al); | [A]US2006116564 (MINTCHEV MARTIN P [CA], et al); | [A]US2007225613 (MABARY JERRY E [US], et al); | [A]WO2008130692 (SIERRA SCIENT INSTR INC [US], et al); | by applicant | US2004254495 |