EP2616135 - CONICAL PORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Couch, Christopher John Unit 12, 338 Fletcher Road Karnup, Western Australia 6176 / AU | [2013/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COUCH, Christopher John Unit 12, 338 Fletcher Road Karnup, Western Australia 6176 / AU | 02 /
HILLS, Robert Charles Patrick 16 Bridge Mews Waikiki Western Australia 6422 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | 01 /
HILLS, Robert Charles Patrick 16 Bridge Mews Waikiki Western Australia 6422 / AU | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | Sanderson, Nigel Paul, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | ||
Former [2013/30] | Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11824372.4 | 19.09.2011 | WO2011AU01204 | Priority number, date | AU20100904201 | 17.09.2010 Original published format: AU 2010904201 | [2013/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012034193 | Date: | 22.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2616135 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 22.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61M39/02, A61B17/02 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
A61F5/0056 (EP,US);
A61M39/0247 (EP,US);
A61B17/0057 (EP,US);
A61B17/0293 (EP,US);
A61M2039/0261 (EP,US);
A61M2039/0273 (EP,US);
A61M2039/0282 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/30] | Title | German: | KEGELFÖRMIGER PORT | [2013/30] | English: | CONICAL PORT | [2013/30] | French: | ORIFICE CONIQUE | [2013/30] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2013 | Search fee paid | 16.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 16.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/30] | 21.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/17] | 09.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.09.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.02.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 26.02.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.03.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2010096589 (INCUMED LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * figure 5 *; | [X]EP0867197 (DISETRONIC LICENSING AG [CH]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US5906596 (TALLARIDA STEVEN J [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9633766 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2009204072 (AMIN MURTAZA YUSUF [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US4393873 (NAWASH MICHAEL S [US], et al); | [A]US4743231 (KAY DONALD A [US], et al); | [X]US4850953 (HABER TERRY M [US], et al); | [X]WO9308729 (YOON INBAE [US]); | [X]US5688247 (HAINDL HANS [DE], et al); | [X]US5911706 (ESTABROOK BRIAN K [US], et al); | [X]US5997515 (DE LA TORRE ROGER A [US], et al); | [X]US6083148 (WILLIAMS JEFFERY A [US]); | [X]WO0172209 (SCOTT GEORGE L III [US], et al); | [X]US6432081 (ATALA ANTHONY [US]); | [A]US2005131325 (CHEN HOW-LUN [US], et al); | [X]US2006217673 (SCHULZE DALE R [US], et al); | [X]US2007083156 (MUTO RUDOLPH [US], et al); | [X]US2007088336 (DALTON MICHAEL J [US]); | [A]US2007161958 (GLENN BRADLEY J [US]); | [X]US2008021375 (BURNS JOHN [US], et al); | [A]US2008119798 (CHANTRIAUX JEAN-FRANCOIS [FR], et al); | [X]US2009118674 (PATTON CATHERINE C [US]); | [X]US2010217200 (UTH JOSHUA [US], et al) |