Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP2616544 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201180054639 EP11824650 IB2011002130 US201113823082



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2013269057Global Dossier 10.10.2013A1
Priority number Date
US38234710 13.09.2010
US201113823082 13.09.2011
WO2011IB02130 13.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103210088Global Dossier 17.07.2013A
Priority number Date
US38234710 13.09.2010
WO2011IB02130 13.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2616544Global Dossier 05.03.2014A4
EP2616544 24.07.2013A2
Priority number Date
US38234710 13.09.2010
WO2011IB02130 13.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112013006043 24.09.2019A2
Priority number Date
US38234710 13.09.2010
WO2011IB02130 13.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2811182 22.03.2012A1
Priority number Date
US38234710 13.09.2010
WO2011IB02130 13.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2013002865 04.11.2013A
Priority number Date
US38234710 13.09.2010
WO2011IB02130 13.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2013116804 20.10.2014A
Priority number Date
US38234710 13.09.2010
WO2011IB02130 13.09.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2012035407Global Dossier 15.11.2012A3
WO2012035407 22.03.2012A2
Priority number Date
US38234710 13.09.2010